Defenders of Wildlife et al v. North Carolina Department of Transportation et al

Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife and National Wildlife Refuge Association
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Transportation, Eugene A. Conti, Jr., Federal Highway Administration and John F. Sullivan, III
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00035
Filed: July 1, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Northern Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 100 Featured Case JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered September 16, 2013, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is denied and the defendants' cross-motions for summary judgment are granted. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 09/16/2013. (Baker, C.)
January 24, 2012 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Intervene - Where the intervention may affect the case scheduled, proposed in Rule 26(f) joint report adopted by the undersigned on November 1, 2011 the parties are DiRECTED to confer and submit to the court within fourteen (14) days of entry of this order a supplement proposing any necessary changes to the current schedule. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/23/2012. (Baker, C.)
January 30, 2012 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 38 Motion to Lodge Administrative Record as Portable Hard Drive - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/27/2012. (Baker, C.)
March 21, 2012 56 Featured Case ORDER denying 51 Motion for Reconsideration - The record shall be filed electronically in accordance with the local rules within twenty-one (21) days hereof. The federal defendants are reminded that a separate case has been created, with case number 2:12-mc-00001-FL, for filing of the record.Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/21/2012. (Baker, C.)
September 16, 2013 99 Featured Case ORDER denying 74 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; and granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/16/2013. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Defenders of Wildlife et al v. North Carolina Department of Transportation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Julia F. Youngman
Represented By: Adam M. Kron
Represented By: Derb S. Carter, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Wildlife Refuge Association
Represented By: Derb S. Carter, Jr.
Represented By: Julia F. Youngman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Transportation
Represented By: Tammy Alice Bouchelle
Represented By: Thomas Daniel Henry, II
Represented By: Scott T. Slusser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene A. Conti, Jr.
Represented By: Tammy Alice Bouchelle
Represented By: Thomas Daniel Henry, II
Represented By: Scott T. Slusser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Highway Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Sullivan, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]