TM, LLC v. Anderson, et al

Plaintiff: TM, LLC
Defendant: Gary Charles Anderson, Katherine Gail Anderson, CYA OBX, LLC, Anderson Homes of the Outer Banks, LLC, Linda Desibia, Elizabeth Desibia, Alexandra Desibia, Quinn Desibia and Paris Faschette
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00071
Filed: December 21, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Northern Division Office
County: DARE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 64 Featured Case ORDER - The Desibia defendants' motion to dismiss (DE # 48) is GRANTED IN PART as to the RICO claims and DENIED IN PART as to lack of personal jurisdiction. Other defendants' first motion for costs and to strike (DE # 50) is DENIED AS MOOT and the second motion for costs and to strike (DE # 55) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as to the request for costs, as set forth in this order, and DENIED as to the request to strike certain allegations from the complaint. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time for service and to conduct discovery (DE # 60) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/26/2012. (Baker, C.)
January 18, 2013 77 Featured Case ORDER granting 66 Motion Objecting to an Award of Costs and denying 73 Motion for Bill of Costs - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 01/18/2013. (Baker, C.)
September 6, 2013 92 Featured Case ORDER granting 91 Motion to Modify Case Management Order - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/06/2013. (Baker, C.)
October 28, 2013 97 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 Motion to Stay All Further Proceedings - All proceedings in this action are stayed through December 10, 2013. This stay automatically terminates such that proceedings in this case may resume December 11, 2013, if a dismis sal is not filed by that time. Plaintiff may notice depositions of the Andersons to occur between December 11, 2013 and January 1, 2014. The parties may file dispositive motions on or before February 1, 2014. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/28/2013. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: TM, LLC v. Anderson, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TM, LLC
Represented By: Chad Cochran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Charles Anderson
Represented By: Neil Wilton Scarborough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Gail Anderson
Represented By: Neil Wilton Scarborough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYA OBX, LLC
Represented By: Neil Wilton Scarborough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Homes of the Outer Banks, LLC
Represented By: Neil Wilton Scarborough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Desibia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Desibia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Desibia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinn Desibia
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paris Faschette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]