Lee v. Town of Seaboard

Defendant: Town of Seaboard
Plaintiff: Brian C. Lee
Case Number: 2:2013cv00020
Filed: March 30, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Northern Division Office
County: NORTHAMPTON
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court GRANTS defendant's 11 motion to dismiss count four, and count four in the amended complaint is DISMISSED. Plaintiff's 20 motion to file a sur-reply is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/17/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
April 14, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by US Magistrate Judge William A. Webb on 4/14/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
September 23, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Compel - Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 9/23/2014. Counsel should read attached Order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. (Tripp, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Town of Seaboard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Seaboard
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Kari R. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian C. Lee
Represented By: Eric Laurence Doggett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]