Perry v. Entertainment One (Koch Records), et al

Plaintiff: Adam L. Perry
Defendant: Entertainment One (Koch Records), Lench Mob Records, William Calhoun and EMI Music, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00022
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Northern Division Office
County: PERQUIMANS
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Court-Hosted Settlement Conference. The case is hereby referred to US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank for a settlement conference pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.2, EDNC. Judge Swank will schedule the conference by separate order. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 2/6/2014. Copy of order to plaintiff via US Mail at address on record. (Marsh, K)
April 23, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Amend/Correct, granting 42 Motion for Summary Judgment, denying 14 Motion to Remand and denying 17 Motion to Remand. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 4/23/2014. Copy of order to plaintiff via US Mail at address on record. (Marsh, K)
April 23, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff's motions to remand are DENIED. Defendant Entertainment One's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. To the extent plaintiff's filing entitled Amend Complaint or Join Addi tional Parties could be deemed a motion, it is DENIED. Judgment is entered in favor of the defendants and this case is closed. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 4/23/2014. Copy of judgment to plaintiff via US Mail at address on record. (Marsh, K)
June 23, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 6/23/2014. Copy of order mailed to plaintiff via US Mail at address on record. (Marsh, K)
January 28, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 64 Motion for Relief of Order or Final Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 1/28/2015. Copy mailed to plaintiff via US Mail at 600 Swamp Road, Hertford, NC 27944. (Marsh, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perry v. Entertainment One (Koch Records), et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam L. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entertainment One (Koch Records)
Represented By: E. Bradley Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lench Mob Records
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMI Music, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.