Swiggett v. PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.

Defendant: PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: M. Dale Swiggett
 
Case Number: 4:2011cv00169
Filed: October 5, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: PAMLICO
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion to Strike - The clerk is required to maintain a record of all papers filed in a civil action. In furtherance of this duty, it is imcumbent on the clerk to keep an accurate docket. Because Swiggett's reply and attachments were mistakenly docketed in this action, the undersigned ORDERS plaintiff's filings entered at docket entry 20 stricken from the record. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 03/20/2012. (Baker, C.)
March 29, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Strike - Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 11 and 15, for good cause shown, and in the interest of justice, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Modification of Complaint (Docket No. 16) is stricken. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/29/2012. (Baker, C.)
July 12, 2012 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion to Stay - All deadlines in the Case Management Order that fall after July 10, 2012 and any and all other actions required of the parties after July 10, 2012 are hereby STAYED pending the Court's determination of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/12/2012. (Baker, C.)
October 29, 2012 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; denying 43 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 44 Motion to Expand Defendant List; denying 45 Motion to Compel; and, dismissing as moot 46 Motion to Strike - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/29/2012. (Baker, C.)
October 29, 2012 48 Featured Case JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered October 29, 2012, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction is granted and this case is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff shall have and recover nothing from this action. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 10/29/2012. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Swiggett v. PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.
Represented By: William P.H. Cary
Represented By: George William House
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Dale Swiggett
Represented By: David S. Henderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]