Rodgers v. Waste Industries Incorporation

Defendant: Waste Industries Incorporation
Plaintiff: Torrick Johntrelle Rodgers
 
Case Number: 4:2012cv00294
Filed: December 7, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: PITT
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Entry of Default - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 02/12/2013. (Baker, C.)
August 19, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 25 Memorandum and Recommendation and granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/19/2013. (Tripp, S.)
August 22, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered August 19, 2013, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED. The Plaintiff shall have and recover nothing from this action. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 08/22/2013. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rodgers v. Waste Industries Incorporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waste Industries Incorporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrick Johntrelle Rodgers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]