Clemonts v. Commissioner of Social Security et al

Defendant: Clerk of U.S. District Court, Commissioner of Social Security, Attorney General and Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: April Michele Clemonts
 
Case Number: 4:2013cv00015
Filed: January 29, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Eastern Division Office
County: HALIFAX
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 28, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/27/2013. Copy sent to the plaintiff via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
March 12, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. The Court VACATES its dismissal order at 28 , GRANTS the plaintiff's Motino for Reconsideration at 30 , and REOPENS THIS CASE. This action will proceed by motions for judgment on the pleadings. Plaintiff's motion must be filed within sixty (60) days of the date of this order, accompanied by a Memorandum in Support. Defendant's motion must be filed within sixty (60) days after the filing of the plaintiff's motion. Failure to comply with these instructions may result in dismissal or other appropriate action. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/11/2014. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
July 16, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and GRANTING 35 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The final decision of the Commissioner is affirmed. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/15/2014. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Clemonts v. Commissioner of Social Security et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clerk of U.S. District Court
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marc D. Epstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Michele Clemonts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]