Weener Plastics, Inc. v. HNH Packaging, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Weener Plastics, Inc.
Defendant: HNH Packaging, LLC and Continental Closures, LLC
 
Case Number: 5:2008cv00496
Filed: September 30, 2008
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: WILSON
Presiding Judge: Maryland Unassigned
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Contract Default

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing 11 Motion for claim and delivery. The court finds that Continental is entitled to issuance of an order of claim and delivery conditioned upon its filing a bond in the amount of $1, 044,000 and otherwise conforming to § 1- 475, and the court's approval of the bond. The bond shall be in the form attached hereto and any surety on the bond shall be approved by the court. The order of claim and delivery shall issue after the approval of the bond. Signed by USMJ James E. Gates on 11/12/2008. (Richards, J.)
April 9, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Continental Closures, LLC, 19 Corrected MOTION to Remand filed by Weener Plastics, Inc., and 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Certain Proceedings filed by Continental Closures, LLC, HNH Packaging, LLC. Objections to M&R due by 4/27/2009. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 04/08/09. Copies served electronically. (Attachments: # 1 M&R Notice) (Baker, C.)
August 19, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting 46 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting 19 Motion to Remand; dismissing without prejudice 44 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing without prejudice 13 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James C. Dever III on 8/19/2009. (Mears, C.)
October 2, 2008 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Defendants' Motion for Claim and Delivery. Defendants have not satisfied the threshold requirement of N.C. Gen. Stat. § 1-472 that they assert a claim for recovery of the property sought in the underlying action. Defendants have leave to refile their motion if and when they rectify the deficiency which is the subject of this order. Signed by USMJ James E. Gates on 10/2/2008. (Richards, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Weener Plastics, Inc. v. HNH Packaging, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weener Plastics, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HNH Packaging, LLC
Represented By: Frank A. Hirsch, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Closures, LLC
Represented By: Frank A. Hirsch, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]