Dalenko v. Stephens et al

Defendant: Donald W. Stephens, Shannon R. Joseph, Sanford L. Steelman, Jr., Barbara A. Jackson and Donna S. Stroud
Plaintiff: Carol Dalenko
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00122
Filed: March 7, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2014 125 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 100 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 102 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 104 Motion to Strike; denying 112 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend; denying 115 Motion For Relief; granting 123 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 2/26/2014. Copy sent to the plantiff via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
June 13, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER denying 14 Motion/Petition for Leave to Waive Exemption From E-Filing. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 6/12/2012. Copy sent to Plaintiff via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
January 8, 2013 94 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 56 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 70 Motion for Extension of Time. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to continue management of this case. The parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/8/2013. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
June 28, 2013 98 Featured Case ORDER denying 83 Motion to Dismiss; granting 86 Motion for Extension of Time; denying as moot 88 Motion to Assign; granting 89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; denying as moot 91 Motion to Amend. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 6/27/2013. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to continue management of this case. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dalenko v. Stephens et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W. Stephens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon R. Joseph
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanford L. Steelman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara A. Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna S. Stroud
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Dalenko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]