UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $9,000.00 in U. S. Currency

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $9,000.00 in U. S. Currency
Case Number: 5:2012cv00158
Filed: March 26, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Entry of Default - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 8/28/2012. (Baker, C.)
September 5, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT -Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/5/2012. (Baker, C.)
March 27, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Seal Document 5 Affidavit - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/27/2012. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $9,000.00 in U. S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Stephen A. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $9,000.00 in U. S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.