Humphries et al v. Whitfield

Plaintiff: William David Humphries and Linda Jane Humphries
Defendant: Tamika S. Whitfield
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00187
Filed: April 9, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: SAMPSON
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 Motion for Leave to Take Deposition. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William A. Webb on 6/12/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
August 28, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion to Seal Document 29 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 8/28/2013. (Marsh, K)
December 10, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff William Humphries is entitled to recover from the unnamed defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company $275,000.00 for personal injury damages and shall bear interest at the legal rate. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff Linda Humphries is entitled to recover from the unnamed defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company $25,000.00 for loss of consortium and shall bear interest at the legal rate. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 12/10/2013. (Marsh, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Humphries et al v. Whitfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William David Humphries
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Hudson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Jane Humphries
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Hudson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamika S. Whitfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]