Kulbir Sidhu, M.D. v. Cancer Centers of North Carolina, P.C., et al

Counter_claimant: Cancer Centers of North Carolina, P.C. and Raleigh Hematology Oncology Associates, P.C.
Counter_defendant: Kulbir Sidhu, M.D.
Defendant: Cancer Centers of North Carolina, P.C. and Raleigh Hematology Oncology Associates, P.C.
Plaintiff: Kulbir Sidhu, M.D.
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00603
Filed: September 17, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss Third Claim for Relief - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/15/2013. (Baker, C.)
August 27, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Stay Regarding 20 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - With limited exceptions, as described more particularly in the attached order, all discovery-related matters in this action are stayed from August 29, 2013 to January 5, 2014, inclusive, while Defendants' lead counsel is on personal leave of absence. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/27/2013. (Baker, C.)
October 2, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/02/2013. (Baker, C.)
October 10, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSOLIDATED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Counsel should review the attached order in its entirety for information pertaining to altered remaining case deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/10/2013. (Baker, C.)
January 9, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/09/2014. (Baker, C.)
June 2, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Stay Discovery and Modify Scheduling Order - Discovery in this case is stayed for 30 days. July 23, 2014 is the new deadline for completion of all discovery in this case. All other deadlines are stayed for thirty (30) days, including but not limited to Defendants' time to respond to the motion to quash of Christopher Willett, MD. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/02/2014. (Baker, C.)
July 25, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy amongthem. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlement not be consummated with in forty-five (45) days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice on or before Monday, September 8, 2014. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/25/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Kulbir Sidhu, M.D. v. Cancer Centers of North Carolina, P.C., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Cancer Centers of North Carolina, P.C.
Represented By: Charles George
Represented By: Leah M. Moore
Represented By: Paul J Puryear, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Raleigh Hematology Oncology Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Charles George
Represented By: Leah M. Moore
Represented By: Paul J Puryear, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Kulbir Sidhu, M.D.
Represented By: J. Heydt Philbeck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cancer Centers of North Carolina, P.C.
Represented By: Paul J Puryear, Jr
Represented By: Leah M. Moore
Represented By: Charles George
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raleigh Hematology Oncology Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Paul J Puryear, Jr
Represented By: Leah M. Moore
Represented By: Charles George
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kulbir Sidhu, M.D.
Represented By: J. Heydt Philbeck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]