Wilson v. ELRAC, INC. et al

Defendant: ELRAC, INC., ELRAC, LLC and The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Plaintiff: Wanda Wilson
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00660
Filed: October 10, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to Seal Document. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William A. Webb on 10/17/2012. (Edwards, S.)
May 20, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice the 30 Motion to Compel; granting 32 Motion to Compel. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William A. Webb on 5/20/2013. (Edwards, S.)
July 11, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER granting 52 Motion to Seal. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 7/11/2013. (Edwards, S.)
October 10, 2013 81 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 44 Motion for Sanctions; granting 56 Motion for Sanctions; granting 58 Motion for Sanctions. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 10/10/2013. (Edwards, S.)
October 10, 2013 82 Featured Case JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Defendants Motions for Summary Judgment are ALLOWED, and all of Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED. Additionally, the Defendants Motions for Sanctions are ALLOWED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove this matter from the courts pretrial and trial calendars. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 10/10/2013. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wilson v. ELRAC, INC. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELRAC, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELRAC, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Epstein
Represented By: Mark E. Anderson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Charlot F. Wood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Wilson
Represented By: Willie R. Perry, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]