U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Harbor Light Asset Management, LLC et al

Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Harbor Light Asset Management, LLC and Michael Anthony Jenkins
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00758
Filed: November 20, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7:25 Fraud - Commodities Leverage Contracts
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 10 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default as to both defendants. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 3/1/2013. (Edwards, S.)
January 23, 2014 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion for Default Judgment. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/22/2014. (Edwards, S.)
February 5, 2014 21 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission against Harbor Light Asset Management, LLC, Michael Anthony Jenkins. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 2/5/2014. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Harbor Light Asset Management, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Romeu-Matta Xavier
Represented By: Manal M. Sultan
Represented By: Nathan B. Ploener
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Light Asset Management, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anthony Jenkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]