RE/MAX, LLC v. M.L. Jones & Associates, Ltd et al

Plaintiff: RE/MAX, LLC
Defendant: M.L. Jones & Associates, Ltd and Matthew L. Jones
Counter_claimant: M.L. Jones & Associates, Ltd and Matthew L. Jones
Counter_defendant: RE/MAX, LLC
Case Number: 5:2012cv00768
Filed: November 26, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 and 23 Motions to Dismiss. The court DISMISSES Jones's and FavoriteAgent.com's fourth, fifth, and sixth counterclaims and Jones's seventh counterclaim. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/29/2013. A copy of the order was mailed to the pro se Defendant Matthew L. Jones. (Sawyer, D.)
October 27, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Motion for Attorney Fees - The request for sanctions is GRANTED, and it is further ordered that Defendant, Matthew L. Jones, shall pay counsel for Plaintiff, Matthew J. Ladenheim, Ian R.Walsworth, and John R. Posthumus, for expenses related to the instant motion in the total amount of$1,000.00, as soon as possible, but not later than November 27, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 10/27/2014. (Tripp, S.)
December 30, 2014 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and DENYING 61 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Remax's motion for partial summary judgment on defendants 9; first two counterclaims 59 . The '048 trademark is an invalid mark under 15 U.S.C. § 1052(b). The court DENIES Remax's motion for partial summary judgment on defendants' third counterclaim and Remax's four claims 61 . Finally, the court orders the parties to participate in a court-hosted mediation with US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/29/14. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (O'Brien, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RE/MAX, LLC v. M.L. Jones & Associates, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RE/MAX, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Ladenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.L. Jones & Associates, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: M.L. Jones & Associates, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Matthew L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: RE/MAX, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Jacob Ladenheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]