Federal Insurance Company et al v. Southern Lithoplate Inc. et al

Defendant: Southern Lithoplate Inc., Spectratech International Inc. and Sam T. Adams
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company and Great Northern Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00793
Filed: December 12, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 47 Motion to Dismiss; granting 73 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot 75 JOINT MOTION TO ADOPT PRIOR BRIEFING OF MOTION TO DISMISS; denying as moot 83 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot 88 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot 96 Motion to Strike. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/14/2014. (Edwards, S.)
March 14, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Travelers motion for judgment on the pleadings is ALLOWED and all claims in the third-party complaint against the Travelers Indemnity Company and the Phoenix Insurance Company are hereby DISMISSED. Southern Lithoplates claims for declaratory judgment and breach of contract against Phoenix and Travelers based on the duty to indemnify are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All other claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Southern Lithoplates motion to strike Travelers Reply Brief is DENIED AS MOOT. The remaining parties have reached a settlement as to all the remaining claims. See Stipulation of Dismissal at [DE-101]. Accordingly, all pending motions not addressed above are DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Susan Edwards,Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 3/14/2014. (Edwards, S.)
May 13, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion to Substitute Party. The Travelers Indemnity Company, Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company, Wausau Business Insurance Company and Liberty Insurance Corporation added. Travelers Insurance Company, Travelers Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company terminated. The Motion to Dismiss 47 and supporting Memorandum of Law 48 filed by the named Third-Party Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance Company shall be deemed fil ed by Wausau Underwriters Insurance Company, Wausau Business Insurance Company and Liberty Insurance Corporation with no need to file any additional or other pleadings in response to this substitution of parties. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 5/10/2013. (Edwards, S.)
August 8, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion to Stay discovery in this case. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 8/8/2013. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company et al v. Southern Lithoplate Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Lithoplate Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectratech International Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam T. Adams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Tracy L. Eggleston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Tracy L. Eggleston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]