United States of America v. Cohen, Jr. et al

Defendant: Shirley O Cohen, North Carolina Department of Revenue and Gettys Cohen, Jr.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv00820
Filed: December 28, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: JOHNSTON
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default as to defendant Gettys Cohen, Jr. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 3/1/2013. (Edwards, S.)
September 9, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 Plaintiff's Motion Confirming Sale and Directing Distribution of Proceeds. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/9/2013. Counsel directed to read Order in its entirety for critical information. (Fisher, M.)
April 25, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 Plaintiff's Motion Confirming Sale and Order for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/24/2014. (Fisher, M.)
June 27, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 34 Motion Confirming Sale and Directing Distribution of Sale Proceeds. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/27/2014. (Fisher, M.)
June 27, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 37 Motion for Order Confirming Sale and Directing Distribution of Sale Proceeds. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/27/2014. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Cohen, Jr. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley O Cohen
Represented By: Travis Philip Sasser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Carolina Department of Revenue
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gettys Cohen, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Anne E. Oliver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]