Rid-A-Pest, Inc. v. American Automobile Insurance Company, et al

Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company and American Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Rid-A-Pest, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00012
Filed: January 7, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WILSON
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 7, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER denying 11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - The court directs the parties to file a supplement to their joint report and plan with suggested deadlines for remaining discovery and dispositive motions. Said supplemental joint report and plan shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days hereof. Thereafter the court will enter its further order on case management. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/07/2013. (Baker, C.)
August 29, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Stay - The parties have tentatively scheduled mediation the week of October 28, 2013. All proceedings in this matter are stayed up through and including November 4, 2013 pending the outcome of the parties' mediation. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/28/2013. (Baker, C.)
December 4, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, this matter is DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the case should settlement not be consummated wit hin forty-five (45) days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice on or before Tuesday, January 21, 2014. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the file as an open one for statistical purposes, this case is removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/04/2013. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rid-A-Pest, Inc. v. American Automobile Insurance Company, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: George H. Pender
Represented By: Brian Matthew Love
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: George H. Pender
Represented By: Brian Matthew Love
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rid-A-Pest, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy C. Curtner
Represented By: Paul N. Blake, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]