Price, et al v. City of Fayetteville, North Carolina, et al

Defendant: Katherine Bryant, City of Fayetteville, North Carolina and John Doe
Plaintiff: Tom Price and William Legg
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00150
Filed: March 1, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/23/2013. (Baker, C.)
May 3, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay Discovery And All Proceedings Pending Appeal - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/03/2013. (Baker, C.)
February 21, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER regarding 37 Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction- The parties have agreed Defendants will not enforce the current literature distribution rule promulgated by Dogwood Festival, Inc. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the parties' agreement and resolve the remaining claims set out in Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/21/2014. (Baker, C.)
May 21, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and denying 51 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/21/2014. (Baker, C.)
August 7, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Tom Price and William Legg against - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 08/07/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Price, et al v. City of Fayetteville, North Carolina, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Bryant
Represented By: Andrew H. Erteschik
Represented By: Karen M. McDonald
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Fayetteville, North Carolina
Represented By: Andrew H. Erteschik
Represented By: Karen M. McDonald
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Andrew H. Erteschik
Represented By: Karen M. McDonald
Represented By: Edwin M. Speas, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Price
Represented By: Nathan W. Kellum
Represented By: Deborah J. Dewart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Legg
Represented By: Deborah J. Dewart
Represented By: Nathan W. Kellum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]