PNC Bank, N.A. v. Welsh Realty, LLC et al

Defendant: Welsh Paper Company, Welsh Realty, LLC, K. Gordon Welsh and Peggy B. Welsh
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00203
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: FRANKLIN
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, DENYING 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, and DENYING 11 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/1/2013. Counsel is directed to read Order in its entirety. (Fisher, M.)
March 25, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 Joint Motion to Stay the Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/24/2014. (Fisher, M.)
September 5, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims, and GRANTING 33 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/4/2014. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: PNC Bank, N.A. v. Welsh Realty, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welsh Paper Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welsh Realty, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Gordon Welsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy B. Welsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian David Darer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]