Barley v. Garrett

Plaintiff: Jesse E. Barley
Defendant: Lieutenant General William Garrett and John McHugh
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00293
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to conduct telephonic hearing - The courtroom hearing scheduled for April 30, 2013, is cancelled, and the hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order shall be conducted by telephone at 1:30 p.m. on April 30, 2013. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/23/2013. (Baker, C.)
June 19, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss; denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 28 Motion to Strike; denying 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/19/2013. (Baker, C.)
June 20, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's orders entered May 1, 2013 and June 19, 2013, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order is denied, plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is denied, defendants' motion to dismiss is granted, and defendants' alternative motion for summary judgment is denied. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 06/20/2013. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Barley v. Garrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse E. Barley
Represented By: Mark L. Waple
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant General William Garrett
Represented By: Neal Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McHugh
Represented By: Neal Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]