Patch Rubber Company v. Toelke

Plaintiff: Patch Rubber Company
Defendant: Kirk Toelke
Intervenor_defendant: REMA TIP TOP / North America, Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00379
Filed: May 24, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: NASH
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order; granting 11 Motion to Set Hearing and/or Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum and granting 12 Consent MOTION to Intervene (Emergency). Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/30/2013. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines. (Downing, L.)
June 14, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is DENIED. As the TRO in this matter has already expired, defendant's motion to dissolve the TRO is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court will consider defendant's motion to dismiss once it has been fully briefed and is ripe for ruling. Plaintiff's 25 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/14/2013. (Edwards, S.)
October 2, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 38 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief Pending Appeal. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/1/2013. Counsel directed to read Order in its entirety. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Patch Rubber Company v. Toelke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patch Rubber Company
Represented By: Patrick O. Peters
Represented By: George J. Oliver
Represented By: Matthew Nis Leerberg
Represented By: Maynard A. Buck, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Toelke
Represented By: Michael Douglas McKnight
Represented By: Robert A. Sar
Represented By: Phillip J. Strach
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: REMA TIP TOP / North America, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick M. Thurman, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]