UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. The McCarty Corporation et al

Defendant: Temple Grading and Construction Company, Inc., Mike McCarty, The McCarty Corporation and John Joseph Parda
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 5:2013cv00409
Filed: June 6, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 18 Defendants' Motion to Strike, DENYING 21 Defendants' Motion to Strike, and DENYING 23 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The quasi-contract claims against the McCarty defendants in counts four and five of the complaint are withdrawn and are no longer part of the case against the McCarty defendants. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever, III on 12/23/2013. (Fisher, M.)
April 22, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER: The court hereby GRANTS the motion 40 and designates United StatesMagistrate Judge Gates for a court-hosted settlement conference. Judge Gates will notify the parties how he wishes to proceed concerning the settlement conference, and the date on which it will be held. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/22/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
May 30, 2014 52 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Excuse Certain Parties from in-person attendance at settlement conference. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 5/30/2014. (Sawyer, D.)
June 24, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion to excuse Local Rule 83.1 Counsel James S. Schenck from attending court-hosted settlement conference under Local Rule 101.2(d). Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 6/24/2014. (Edwards, S.)
July 15, 2014 77 Featured Case ORDER granting 76 Motion to Stay and Suspension of Deadlines for 120 Days to Enable Completion of Settlement Agreement Conditions - The action is stayed until November 14, 2014. The court further orders Magistrate Judge Gates to facilitate completion of the settlement as he deems appropriate, which may include holding status conferences every thirty days. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 07/15/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. The McCarty Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temple Grading and Construction Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike McCarty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The McCarty Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Joseph Parda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Neal Fowler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]