Marketel Media, Inc. et al v. Mediapotamus, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Marketel Media, Inc. and Samuel T Hassell
Defendant: Mediapotamus, Inc. and Kelly J Ortiz
Case Number: 5:2013cv00427
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: 12 Motion to Transfer is DENIED. The two actions are consolidated. These actions shall proceed under the caption at case number 5:13-CV-427-D. Counsel for the parties shall meet and confer to address administrative and scheduling issues arising from the consolidation and submit a joint status report and proposed schedule not later than December 6, 2013. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/8/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
December 29, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING 48 Motion to Compel; GRANTING 53 Motion to Seal; GRANTING 57 Motion to Seal; and GRANTING 60 Motion to Seal: The court refers the motion to compel 48 to US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates for disposition. The court GRANTS the motions to seal at 53 , 57 , and 60 .Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/29/14. (O'Brien, C.)
May 19, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART: 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court grants summary judgment to movants on defendants' claims three, four, five, and eight, and summary judgement with re spect to Intelimarc on claims two and six. The court dismisses Intelimarc as a defendant. Defendants may proceed to trial on claims one (as limited), two, six, seven, nine, and ten. If defendants fail to serve "DOES 1-1 0" before June 30, 2015, the "DOES" shall be dismissed as defendants without further order of the court. The court also orders the parties to participate in court-hosted mediation with United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 5/19/2015. (O'Brien, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marketel Media, Inc. et al v. Mediapotamus, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marketel Media, Inc.
Represented By: William Sutton Cherry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel T Hassell
Represented By: William Sutton Cherry, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediapotamus, Inc.
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Alka Srivastava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly J Ortiz
Represented By: Dan M. Hartzog
Represented By: Alka Srivastava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.