Domtar AI Inc. et al v. J. D. Irving, Ltd. et al

Defendant: J. D. Irving, Ltd. and James DeFelice
Plaintiff: Associated Hygienic Products LLC and Domtar AI Inc.
 
Case Number: 5:2014cv00058
Filed: January 31, 2014
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and HOLDING IN ABEYANCE 16 Defendants' Motion to Stay. The Defendants' Motion to Stay will be held in abeyance until motions practice before this Court has concluded. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/6/2014. (Fisher, M.)
August 20, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 40 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or in the alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, DENYING AS MOOT 45 Plaintiffs' Motion for Discovery, and DENYING 50 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal Document. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/18/2014. (Fisher, M.)
September 29, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 64 Joint Motion for Extension of Time, and DENYING AS MOOT 65 Joint Motion to Stay. Defendants have until October 20, 2014, to file their reply brief related to 52 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs have until October 27, 2014, t o file their opposition to the 57 Second Motion for Sanctions. To clear up any confusion, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly for the reasons given in the August 20, 2014 order at 55 . Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/27/2014. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Domtar AI Inc. et al v. J. D. Irving, Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Irving, Ltd.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James DeFelice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Associated Hygienic Products LLC
Represented By: Richard Scott McAtee
Represented By: Matthew David Duncan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domtar AI Inc.
Represented By: Richard Scott McAtee
Represented By: Matthew David Duncan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]