Trueman v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Trueman
Defendant: United States of America, Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) Wilmington North Carolina Outpatient Clinic (WVAOPC), Sharon F. Troyon and Charles E. Best, Jr.
Case Number: 7:2012cv00073
Filed: March 29, 2012
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: NEWHANOVER
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 26 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting 16 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Charles E. Best, Jr., Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) Wilmington North Carolin a Outpatient Clinic (WVAOPC), Sharon F. Troyon and United States of America answer due 4/12/2013 or when Plaintiff files an amended complaint, whichever is earlier. The parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety for further information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/22/2013. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
June 17, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 33 Motion to Strike. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint with all words written in plain English, within twenty-one (21) days of the filing date of this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a responsive pleading within forty-five(45) days of when Plaintiff files an amended complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 6/17/2013. Copy sent to the plaintiff via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
September 17, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 9/17/2013. Copy sent to the plaintiff via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
March 17, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the tort claims; granting in part 49 Motion to Amend; denying 55 Motion for Hearing. The Plaintiff is directed to file his amended complaint on or before 4/4/2014. The United Stat es has thirty (30) days from plaintiff's service of the complaint to file an answer or appropriate motion. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit completed summonses for the individual defendants by 4/4/2014. The parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/17/2014. Copy sent to the plaintiff via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
March 31, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Injunction Order to Prevent Termination of Plaintiff's Improved Pension (IP) Benefits. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/31/2014. Copy sent to the plaintiff via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
March 30, 2015 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion to Dismiss; denying 76 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying 78 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/30/2015. Certified copy sent to Jeffrey Trueman at 410 Turtlehead Drive, Longs, SC 29568 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
March 30, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that pursuant to the courts order dated March 17, 2014, the United States Motion to Dismiss the tort claims asserted against it is ALLOWED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Defendan ts Motion to Dismiss is ALLOWED, the Plaintiffs Motion to Amend is DENIED, the Plaintiffs Motion to Compel is DENIED, and Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 3/30/2015. Certified copy sent to Jeffrey Trueman at 410 Turtlehead Drive, Longs, SC 29568 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trueman v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Trueman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Sharon C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) Wilmington North Carolina Outpatient Clinic (WVAOPC)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon F. Troyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Best, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]