Manion v. Spectrum Healthcare Resources et al

Plaintiff: Kernan T. Manion
Defendant: Spectrum Healthcare Resources and Nitelines Kuhana JV LLC
 
Case Number: 7:2012cv00247
Filed: August 22, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: NEWHANOVER
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 22 Defendant Nitelines' Motion to Dismiss, and DENYING 38 Defendant Spectrum's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Counsel is directed to read Order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/6/2013. (Fisher, M.)
November 8, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 53 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal, and DENYING 55 Motion for Certificate of Appealability, Motion to Amend, and Motion to Stay. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/8/2013. (Fisher, M.)
May 6, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 71 Niteline's Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this matter. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/6/2014. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Manion v. Spectrum Healthcare Resources et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kernan T. Manion
Represented By: Kyle J. Nutt
Represented By: Richard R. Renner
Represented By: Gary K. Shipman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Healthcare Resources
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nitelines Kuhana JV LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]