Redmond et al v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC

Plaintiff: Timothy Redmond and Colleen Redmond
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
 
Case Number: 7:2012cv00258
Filed: September 5, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BRUNSWICK
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/20/2013. (Edwards, S.)
March 27, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 34 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTING 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Phyiscal Exhibit; and GRANTING 42 Motion to Seal Document /Substitute. Plaintiffs are ordered to substitue the redacted version of Exhibit C of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment submitted by Green Tree in support of its motions to substitute within five days of this order. The Exhibit C provisionally filed by the plaintiffs under seal shall remain sealed. The clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to close this file after the appropriate substitution is made. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/25/2014. (Fisher, M.)
June 10, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/9/2014. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Redmond et al v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Redmond
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Dowd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Redmond
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Dowd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]