Price v. M.R.S. Associates, Inc., et al

Defendant: M.R.S. Associates, Inc. and Vital Recovery Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Keita Eugena Price
 
Case Number: 7:2013cv00013
Filed: January 16, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BLADEN
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment, granting 21 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default, and granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Answer. Defendant M.R.S. Associate, Inc. shall file its answer not later than 5/31/2013. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 5/14/2013. (Sawyer, D.)
June 27, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Price's state-law claim concerning N.C. Gen. Stat. § 58-70-115 and § 58-70-1 and REMANDS this claim to Bladen County Superior Court. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever, III on 6/27/2014. (Edwards, S.)
June 27, 2014 38 Featured Case JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the court hereby GRANTS MRSs motion for summary judgment on Prices federal-law claims and on one of Prices state-law claims. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Prices sta te-law claim concerning N.C. Gen.Stat. § 58-70-115 and § 58-70 and REMANDS this claim to Bladen County Superior Court. The clerk shall close the case. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 6/27/2014. (Edwards, S.)
February 27, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion for Entry of Default against Defendant M.R.S. Associates, Inc. Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 2/27/2013. (Sawyer, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Price v. M.R.S. Associates, Inc., et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.R.S. Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vital Recovery Services, Inc.
Represented By: Caren D. Enloe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keita Eugena Price
Represented By: Christopher W. Livingston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]