Life Insurance Company of North America v. Haywood, et al

Plaintiff: Life Insurance Company of North America
Defendant: Billie Faye Haywood and Terry L. Ferrell
 
Case Number: 7:2013cv00052
Filed: March 26, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 MOTION FOR DISCHARGE FROM FURTHER LIABILITY, PERMANENT INJUNCTION, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, AND DISMISSAL, AND REQUEST FOR EXEMPTION FROM THE RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE - The court finds that plaintiff is a disinterested stak eholder, having fulfilled its contractual obligations by depositing that sum with the clerk, into the courts registry funds. Defendants are enjoined from prosecuting any action against plaintiff, the plan, or the decedent's former employer, Food Lion, LLC, related to the life insurance benefits payable as a consequence of the death of Carlton C. Haywood, except by way of interpleader in this action. Plaintiff is discharged from any and all further liability related to the insurance benefits at issue. The court awards plaintiff the sum of $3,504.06, and the costs of the action in the amount of $362.20, said amounts to be paid to plaintiff by the clerk from the funds deposited. Plaintiff now is dismissed, with prejudice. Now wi th reference to the court's Initial Order entered July 29, 2013, defendants are herein noticed that the court lifts its stay, and sets a new date of October 11, 2013, for submission of the parties' joint report and plan in preface to its entry of a case management order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 09/24/2013. (Baker, C.)
April 2, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 33 Motion for Default Judgment - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/02/2014. (Baker, C.)
April 3, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Billie Faye Haywood - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 04/03/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Life Insurance Company of North America v. Haywood, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Manning A. Connors, III
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billie Faye Haywood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L. Ferrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]