Costin v. Ally Bank Corp.

Plaintiff: Teresa Ann Costin
Defendant: Ally Bank Corp.
 
Case Number: 7:2013cv00113
Filed: May 28, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Southern Division Office
County: PENDER
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 12 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, and DENYING 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Defer Briefing on the Motion for Costs. Parties are ordered to proceed in briefing the motion for payment of costs. The matter may proceed in its entirety. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/9/2013. (Fisher, M.)
October 11, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 7 Defendant's Motion for Payment of Costs and to Stay. The matter may proceed in its entirety. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/10/2013. Counsel is directed to read Order in its entirety for critical information. (Fisher, M.)
January 13, 2014 27 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Counts two through six of the complaint are DISMISSED. The plaintiff's sole remaining claim is REMANDED to Pender County Superior Court for resolution. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/13/2013. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Costin v. Ally Bank Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Ann Costin
Represented By: J. Matthew Norris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Bank Corp.
Represented By: Kelli Ann Ovies
Represented By: Clifton L. Brinson
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]