CARRINGTON et al v. DUKE UNIVERSITY et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs are 38 members of the 2006 Duke University men\'s lacrosse team, as well as certain members of their families. Plaintiffs alleged that Defendants Durham officials acted corruptly by concealing exculpatory evidence, manufacturing inculpatory evidence, rigging photo line-ups, tampering and intimidating witnesses, and lying to the Court. Plaintiffs alleged that Duke officials failed to disclose and actively suppressed material exculpatory evidence.

Plaintiff: EDWARD CARRINGTON, CASEY J. CARROLL, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS, KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR., MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT and MICHAEL YOUNG
Defendant: DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, J. WESLEY COVINGTON, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU, CITY OF DURHAM, LINWOOD WILSON, MARK GOTTLIEB, BENJAMIN HIMAN, PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER and DAVID ADDISON
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00119
Filed: February 21, 2008
 
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Durham
Presiding Judge: JAMES A. BEATY
Referring Judge: WALLACE W. DIXON
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2010 163 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 10/15/2010, that all Plaintiffs' claims against Marsha Saunders Covington, as the executrix of the Estate of John Wesley Covington, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. (Daniel, J)
October 14, 2010 Motion(s) Submitted: 162 MOTION to Dismiss to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. (Kemp, Donita)
October 14, 2010 162 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Plaintiffs' Claims Against Marsha Covington, As The Executrix of the Estate of John Wesley Covington by EDWARD CARRINGTON, CASEY J. CARROLL, GALE CATALINO, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS, KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, IRENE GREER, ZACHARY GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, MARK KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, BARBARA LOFTUS, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, LYNNDA O'HARA, NICHOLAS O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JON BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR., MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG. Responses due by 11/8/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (THOMAS, WILLIAM) Modified on 10/15/2010 to edit text to accurately reflect document title. (Lloyd, Donna)
August 2, 2010 161 ANSWER to 145 First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by MARSHA SAUNDERS COVINGTON. (KYRE, KENNETH)
June 2, 2010 160 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS of MARSHA SAUNDERS COVINGTON. Waiver sent on 6/2/2010, answer due 8/2/2010. (THOMAS, WILLIAM) Modified on 6/3/2010 to remove party filer names (Lee, Lisa).
May 10, 2010 159 Featured Case ORDER granting 158 Motion to Substitute Party. MARSHA SAUNDERS COVINGTON added. J. WESLEY COVINGTON terminated. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 5/10/2010. (Lee, Lisa)
May 4, 2010 Motions Submitted: 154 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, 149 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, 158 MOTION to Substitute Party Marsha Saunders Covington for J. Wesley Covington, 151 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, 153 MOTION to Dismiss [RENEWED] First Amended Complaint, 148 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 2nd Amended Complaint, 146 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, 147 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, 152 MOTION to Dismiss [RENEWED] First Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss [RENEWED] First Amended Complaint, 150 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. (Kemp, Donita)
May 3, 2010 158 MOTION to Substitute Party Marsha Saunders Covington for J. Wesley Covington by EDWARD CARRINGTON, CASEY J. CARROLL, GALE CATALINO, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS, KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, IRENE GREER, ZACHARY GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, MARK KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, BARBARA LOFTUS, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, LYNNDA O'HARA, NICHOLAS O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG. Responses due by 5/27/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Death Certificate, # 2 Exhibit Letters of Testamentary, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(THOMAS, WILLIAM)
April 19, 2010 157 REPLY BRIEF with Respect to the City of Durham's Supplemental 156 Brief in Support of its' 154 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by CITY OF DURHAM. (GILLESPIE, REGINALD) Modified on 4/20/2010 to reflect accurate title of pldg. (Lee, Lisa).
April 5, 2010 156 Opposition to The City of Durham's 155 Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; filed by EDWARD CARRINGTON, CASEY J. CARROLL, GALE CATALINO, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS, KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, IRENE GREER, ZACHARY GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, MARK KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, BARBARA LOFTUS, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, LYNNDA O'HARA, NICHOLAS O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG. Replies due by 4/22/2010. (COOPER, CHARLES) Modified on 4/6/2010 to reflect accurate title of pldg. (Lee, Lisa).
March 15, 2010 155 City of Durham's Supplemental BRIEF re 154 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
March 15, 2010 154 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by CITY OF DURHAM. Responses due by 4/8/2010 (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
March 15, 2010 153 MOTION to Dismiss [RENEWED] First Amended Complaint by THERESA ARICO, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TARA LEVICY. (GORELICK, JAMIE)
March 15, 2010 152 MOTION to Dismiss [RENEWED] First Amended Complaint by RICHARD BRODHEAD, JOHN BURNESS, ROBERT DEAN, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, DUKE UNIVERSITY, VICTOR DZAU, AARON GRAVES, KATE HENDRICKS, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK. (GORELICK, JAMIE)
March 11, 2010 151 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by BENJAMIN HIMAN. Responses due by 4/5/2010 (SAPPENFIELD, HENRY)
March 10, 2010 150 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, BEVERLY COUNCIL, RONALD HODGE, JEFF LAMB, STEPHEN MIHAICH, MICHAEL RIPBERGER, LEE RUSS. Responses due by 4/5/2010 (KERNER, PATRICIA)
March 10, 2010 149 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by DAVID ADDISON. Responses due by 4/5/2010 (MAXWELL, JAMES)
March 10, 2010 148 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 2nd Amended Complaint by DAVID ADDISON. Responses due by 4/5/2010 (MAXWELL, JAMES)
March 9, 2010 147 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by MARK GOTTLIEB. Responses due by 4/2/2010 (STEVENS, ERIC)
March 4, 2010 146 MOTION to Renew 80 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; filed by LINWOOD WILSON. Responses due by 3/29/2010 (WILSON, LINWOOD) Modified on 3/5/2010 to reflect accurate title of pldg. (Lee, Lisa).
February 22, 2010 145 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant DAVID ADDISON, THERESA ARICO, PATRICK BAKER, RICHARD BRODHEAD, JOHN BURNESS, STEVEN CHALMERS, CITY OF DURHAM, BEVERLY COUNCIL, J. WESLEY COVINGTON, ROBERT DEAN, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., VICTOR DZAU, MARK GOTTLIEB, AARON GRAVES, KATE HENDRICKS, BENJAMIN HIMAN, RONALD HODGE, JEFF LAMB, PETER LANGE, TARA LEVICY, STEPHEN MIHAICH, LARRY MONETA, MICHAEL RIPBERGER, LEE RUSS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, LINWOOD WILSON, filed by SAM PAYTON, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, JOYCE KOESTERER, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, DANIEL LOFTUS, JOHN E. JENNISON, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, MICHAEL WARD, BARBARA LOFTUS, MARK KOESTERER, KYLE DOWD, LYNNDA O'HARA, KENNETH SAUER, III, PATRICIA DOWD, GLENN NICK, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, DANIEL FLANNERY, IRENE GREER, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, BEN KOESTERER, CASEY J. CARROLL, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, EDWARD CARRINGTON, NICHOLAS O'HARA, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, BRET THOMPSON, ZACHARY GREER, ADAM LANGLEY, FRED KROM, TRACY TKAC, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, PETER J. LAMADE, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, KEVIN COLEMAN, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS, MICHAEL YOUNG, EDWARD J. CROTTY, DEVON SHERWOOD, GALE CATALINO, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, ROBERT SCHROEDER, JOHN WALSH, JR, THOMAS V. CLUTE.(COOPER, CHARLES)
February 16, 2010 144 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 2/16/10, that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint [Doc. # 140 ] is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs must file their First Amended Complaint within seven (7) days of this Order. FURTHER that the previously-filed Motions to Dismiss [consolidated at Doc. # 72 ] will be terminated as MOOT. Defendants may file renewed Motions to Dismiss within 21 days after the First Amended Complaint is filed, but those renewed Motions to Dismiss should not be accompanied by any further briefing, and should instead incorporate any previous briefing by reference to the relevant docket numbers in this case. FURTHER that the City may file an additional supplemental supporting memorandum not to exceed 20 pages addressing new matters reflected in the First Amended Complaint, and a Response to the supplemental memorandum, not to exceed 20 pages, may be filed within 21 days thereafter, with a Reply not to exceed 10 pages filed 14 days later. (Welch, Kelly)
January 7, 2010 143 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority re 72 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants DAVID ADDISON, PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, CITY OF DURHAM, BEVERLY COUNCIL, MARK GOTTLIEB, BENJAMIN HIMAN, RONALD HODGE, JEFF LAMB, STEPHEN MIHAICH, MICHAEL RIPBERGER, LEE RUSS. (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
October 2, 2009 ***Motions Submitted: 140 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. (Kemp, Donita)
September 28, 2009 142 REPLY to Response to 140 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (COOPER, CHARLES) Modified on 9/29/2009 to remove duplicate text (Lee, Lisa).
September 24, 2009 141 RESPONSE re 140 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by CITY OF DURHAM. Replies due by 10/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order on MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint)(GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
September 1, 2009 140 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Redline of Original and First Amended Complaint, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(COOPER, CHARLES)
August 25, 2009 139 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRIAN S. KOUKOUTCHOS on behalf of Plaintiffs KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS (KOUKOUTCHOS, BRIAN)
August 25, 2009 138 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney NICOLE JO MOSS on behalf of Plaintiffs KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS (MOSS, NICOLE)
July 14, 2009 137 Plaintiffs' Combined RESPONSE to Defendants' Supplemental Briefs Regarding Ashcroft v. Iqbal, re 136 Brief, 132 Brief, 134 Brief, 135 Brief, 133 Brief; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 7/31/2009. (COOPER, CHARLES) Modified on 7/15/2009 to reflect accurate title of pldg. (Lee, Lisa).
June 24, 2009 136 Supplemental BRIEF In Support Of Linwood Wilson's Motion To Dismiss 80 by Defendant LINWOOD WILSON filed by LINWOOD WILSON. (WILSON, LINWOOD)
June 24, 2009 135 Supplemental BRIEF re 69 Memorandum, 73 Brief, 67 Brief, 72 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants CITY OF DURHAM, MARK GOTTLIEB, BENJAMIN HIMAN filed by CITY OF DURHAM, MARK GOTTLIEB, BENJAMIN HIMAN. (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
June 24, 2009 134 Supplemental BRIEF re 59 Memorandum, 103 Reply to Response to Motion, 61 Memorandum, 106 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment I -- Iqbal Complaint)(KERNER, PATRICIA)
June 24, 2009 133 Joint Supplemental BRIEF re 65 Memorandum, 105 Reply to Response to Motion, 63 Memorandum,, 104 Reply to Response to Motion, by Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU. (GORELICK, JAMIE)
June 24, 2009 132 COVINGTON'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re 70 Answer to Complaint, 71 Brief, 108 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss, 74 Motion to Dismiss. (KYRE, KENNETH)
June 4, 2009 131 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 6/4/2009 that within 20 days of the date of this Order, any of the previously-designated Defendant groups may file a Supplemental Brief, not to exceed 20 pages, addressing the impact of the Supreme Court's decision in Ashcroft v. Iqbal, 129 S. Ct. 1937 (2009), on the resolution of the pending Motions to Dismiss in this case. FURTHER that within 20 days after such Supplemental Briefs are filed, Plaintiffs may file a Response Brief, not to exceed 20 pages, responding to any issues raised in the Supplemental Briefs. (Lee, Lisa)
May 27, 2009 130 Suggestion of Subsequently Decided Authority supplementing Motions to Dismiss by Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(GORELICK, JAMIE)
March 30, 2009 129 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 3/30/2009 that for administrative purposes, the various Motions to Dismiss (Doc. # 58 , # 60 , # 62 , # 64 , # 66 , # 68 , # 70 & # 74 , # 72 , and # 80 ) are CONSOLIDATED into a single Motion to Dismiss (designated as Doc. # 72 ) for further review and consideration by the Court. (Lee, Lisa)
March 30, 2009 128 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 3/30/2009 that Defendant Linwood Wilson's Motion to Disqualify Counsel (Doc. # 75 ) is DENIED. (Lee, Lisa)
March 22, 2009 127 FIRST SUPPLEMENT to 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Governmental Immunity) by Defendant CITY OF DURHAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (GILLESPIE, REGINALD) Modified on 3/23/2009 to reflect accurate title of pldg. (Lee, Lisa).
February 27, 2009 126 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Defendant MARK GOTTLIEB. DAVID WILLIAM LONG is substituted as counsel for Defendant. Attorney EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR terminated. (LONG, DAVID)
January 26, 2009 125 NOTICE of Change of Address by JAMES DONALD COWAN, JR (COWAN, JAMES)
December 29, 2008 ***Motions Submitted: 68 MOTION to Dismiss, 58 MOTION to Dismiss, 74 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), 66 MOTION to Dismiss, 80 MOTION to Dismiss, 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Governmental Immunity), 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, 75 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel, 60 MOTION to Dismiss, 62 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, 72 MOTION to Dismiss to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. (Kemp, Donita)
December 15, 2008 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CITY OF DURHAM re 121 Affidavit, 120 Affidavit, 122 Affidavit (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
December 12, 2008 123 REPLY to Response to 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Governmental Immunity) filed by CITY OF DURHAM. (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
December 12, 2008 122 AFFIDAVIT of Arche L. McAdoo re 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Governmental Immunity) filed by CITY OF DURHAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
December 12, 2008 121 AFFIDAVIT of J. Steven Lee re 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Governmental Immunity) filed by CITY OF DURHAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
December 12, 2008 120 AFFIDAVIT of Amy M. DeLorenze re 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Governmental Immunity) filed by CITY OF DURHAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
November 24, 2008 119 RESPONSE in Opposition to 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Governmental Immunity) filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 12/12/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Affidavit of David Lehn, # 2 Exhibit B -- City of Durham, Resolution #9200: Resolution to Adopt a Policy to Waive Governmental Immunity in Limited Circumstances, # 3 Exhibit C -- Durham City Council, Meeting Minutes (June 20, 2005), # 4 Exhibit D -- Ray Gronberg, "Lacrosse Suits So Far Cost City $729,350," Herald-Sun (Sept. 23, 2008), # 5 Exhibit E -- Bassett Seamless Guttering, Inc. v. Gutterguard, LLC) (LEHN, DAVID)
November 14, 2008 118 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID M. LEHN on behalf of Plaintiffs KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS (LEHN, DAVID)
November 12, 2008 117 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 11/12/08, that Plaintiffs' Motion to Require Defendants to Participate in a Rule 26(f) Conference [Document # 57 ] is DENIED. (Law, Trina)
October 24, 2008 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CITY OF DURHAM re 114 Affidavit of Darwin Laws and attached Exhibits 1, 2, and 3 (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
October 22, 2008 115 BRIEF re 114 Affidavit, 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Governmental Immunity). (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
October 22, 2008 114 AFFIDAVIT of Darwin Laws re 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Governmental Immunity) filed by Defendant CITY OF DURHAM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
October 22, 2008 113 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Governmental Immunity) by CITY OF DURHAM. Responses due by 11/24/2008 (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
October 17, 2008 112 NOTICE of Change of Address by ERIC P. STEVENS (STEVENS, ERIC)
October 17, 2008 111 NOTICE of Change of Address by EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR (SPEAS, EDWIN)
September 29, 2008 110 REPLY, filed by Defendant LINWOOD WILSON, to Response to 80 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LINWOOD WILSON. (Crumley, Billy)
September 29, 2008 109 REPLY BRIEF in Support of 72 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by CITY OF DURHAM. (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
September 29, 2008 108 REPLY BRIEF in Support of 74 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6); filed by J. WESLEY COVINGTON. (KYRE, KENNETH)
September 29, 2008 107 JOINT REPLY to their separate Motions to Dismiss - 68 MOTION to Dismiss, 66 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by MARK GOTTLIEB, BENJAMIN HIMAN. (SPEAS, EDWIN)
September 29, 2008 106 REPLY in Support of 60 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER. (KERNER, PATRICIA)
September 29, 2008 105 REPLY BRIEF in Support of 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Duke SANE Defendants; filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO. (GORELICK, JAMIE)
September 29, 2008 104 REPLY BRIEF in Support of 62 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Duke University Defendants; filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY, RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU. (GORELICK, JAMIE)
September 26, 2008 103 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of 58 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by DAVID ADDISON. (MAXWELL, JAMES)
September 16, 2008 102 AMENDMENT to 94 Response in Opposition to Motion As explained further in Exhibit 1, this amended brief corrects a factual assertion on page 4-5.; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Explanation of Amendment) (COOPER, CHARLES)
September 16, 2008 101 AMENDMENT to 92 Response in Opposition to Motion As explained further in Exhibit 1, this amended brief corrects a factual assertion on page 5.; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Explanation of Amendment) (COOPER, CHARLES)
September 16, 2008 100 AMENDMENT to 95 Response in Opposition to Motion As explained further in Exhibit 1, this amended brief corrects a factual assertion on page 31; filed by ED DOCUMENT by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (COOPER, CHARLES)
September 10, 2008 99 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 9/10/2008 that Defendant Linwood Wilsons Motion (Document # 86 ) is GRANTED, and after Defendant Wilson completes the training required by the Clerk's Office, Defendant Wilson may register as a Filing User in the Court's Electronic Case Filing System with respect solely to the present action. (Lee, Lisa)
September 4, 2008 98 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 9/4/2008 granting 87 Consent Motion for L. Cooper Harrell Esq. and Smith Moore Leatherwood LLP to Withdraw as Attorney of record for defendants Duke University, Richard H. Brodhead, Peter Lange, Larry Moneta, John Burness, Tallman Trask, Suzanne Wasiolek, Matthew Drummond, Aaron Graves, Robert Dean, Kate Hendricks, and Victor J. Dzau. (Lee, Lisa)
September 3, 2008 ***Motions Submitted: 86 MOTION to Allow Defendant Linwood Wilson to use the CM/ECF System to File Documents Electronically, 87 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney LESLIE COOPER HARRELL to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. (Kemp, Donita)
August 28, 2008 97 RESPONSE in Opposition re 64 The Duke Sane Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 9/15/2008. (COOPER, CHARLES)
August 28, 2008 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re 62 The Duke University Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 9/15/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 -- Agreement for Police Cooperation, Mutual Aid, and Campus Law Enforcement Agency Extended Jurisdiction, # 2 Exhibit 2 -- North Carolina Session 2003, Chapter 329, House Bill 736) (COOPER, CHARLES)
August 28, 2008 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 Durham's MOTION to Dismiss; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 9/15/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Order of July 21, 2006 in the Superior Court, State of North Carolina, Durham County) (COOPER, CHARLES)
August 28, 2008 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re 70 Answer to Complaint, 66 Benjamin Himan's MOTION to Dismiss filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 9/15/2008. (COOPER, CHARLES)
August 28, 2008 93 RESPONSE in Opposition re 60 Durham Supervisor's MOTION to Dismiss filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 9/15/2008. (COOPER, CHARLES)
August 28, 2008 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re 68 Mark Gottlieb's MOTION to Dismiss filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 9/15/2008. (COOPER, CHARLES)
August 28, 2008 91 RESPONSE in Opposition re 74 J. Wesley Covington's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 9/15/2008. (COOPER, CHARLES)
August 28, 2008 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 David Addison's MOTION to Dismiss filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 9/15/2008. (COOPER, CHARLES)
August 28, 2008 89 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHARLES J. COOPER on behalf of Plaintiffs KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS (COOPER, CHARLES)
August 12, 2008 88 NOTICE of Change of Address by JAMES DONALD COWAN, JR (COWAN, JAMES)
August 6, 2008 87 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney LESLIE COOPER HARRELL by on behalf of DUKE UNIVERSITY. Responses due by 8/29/2008 (HARRELL, LESLIE)
July 29, 2008 86 MOTION to Allow Defendant Linwood Wilson to use the CM/ECF System to File Documents Electronically; filed by LINWOOD WILSON. Responses due by 8/21/2008. (Lee, Lisa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2008: # 1 Main Document) (Lee, Lisa).
July 25, 2008 85 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 7/25/2008 that Plaintiffs' 83 Motion to Clarify or In the Alternative for An Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Linwood Wilson's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss is granted. Plaintiffs' response is due August 28, 2008. Plaintiffs shall follow the page limits set forth in the April 14, 2008 scheduling order for the purpose of responding to Defendant Linwood Wilson's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Lee, Lisa)
July 24, 2008 84 Amended MOTION to Clarify or in the alternative Extend Time to Respond to Defendant Linwood Wilson's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Responses due by 8/18/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (COOPER, CHARLES) Modified on 7/25/2008 to reflect accurate title of pldg. (Lee, Lisa).
July 24, 2008 ***Motions Submitted: 83 MOTION for Clarification 51 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, or in the Alternative Extend Time To Respond to Defendant Linwood Wilson's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. (Kemp, Donita)
July 23, 2008 ***Motions Submitted: 57 MOTION for Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. (Kemp, Donita)
July 21, 2008 83 MOTION for Clarification of 51 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, or in the Alternative Extend Time To Repsoned to Defendant Linwood Wilson's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Responses due by 8/13/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)( COOPER, CHARLES)
July 3, 2008 82 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS, to Response to 57 MOTION for Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference MOTION for Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference MOTION for Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference MOTION for Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (COOPER, CHARLES)
July 2, 2008 81 RESPONSE to Defendant Linwood Wilson's Motion to Disqualify Attorney William J. Thomas filed by Plaintiffs KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS re 75 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by LINWOOD WILSON filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 7/21/2008. (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
June 26, 2008 80 MOTION to DISMISS and BRIEF in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by LINWOOD WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Envelope (Front)) (Lee, Lisa). Modified on 9/30/2008 to reflect that this pleading is a Motion and combined Memorandum (Lee, Lisa).
June 19, 2008 79 MEMORANDUM in RESPONSE to 57 MOTION for Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference filed by LINWOOD WILSON. Replies due by 7/7/2008. (Lee, Lisa)
June 16, 2008 78 RESPONSE BRIEF in Opposition to 57 MOTION for Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference filed by J. WESLEY COVINGTON. Replies due by 6/26/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unpublished Cases) (KYRE, KENNETH) Modified on 6/17/2008 to remove duplicate text (Lee, Lisa).
June 16, 2008 77 RESPONSE to 57 MOTION for Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU. Replies due by 7/3/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6) (GORELICK, JAMIE) Modified on 6/17/2008 to remove duplicate text (Lee, Lisa).
June 16, 2008 76 MEMORANDUM in Response to 57 MOTION for Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference MOTION for Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference; filed by CITY OF DURHAM, MARK GOTTLIEB, BENJAMIN HIMAN, PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER, DAVID ADDISON. Replies due by 7/3/2008. (GILLESPIE, REGINALD) Modified on 6/17/2008 to remove duplicate text (Lee, Lisa).
June 10, 2008 75 MOTION to Disqualify Attorney William J. Thomas under 27 NCAC02 Rule 3.7 Lawyer as witness; United States District Court as defined in LR83.53.7 of Northern District of Illinois Lawyer as witness filed by LINWOOD WILSON. Responses due by 7/3/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4, # 5 Envelope (Front)) (Lee, Lisa)
June 2, 2008 74 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by J. WESLEY COVINGTON. Responses due by 8/28/2008 (KYRE, KENNETH)
June 2, 2008 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) re 70 Answer to Complaint and Motion to Dismiss. Answer and Motion filed as one pleading. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.3(a), each motion shall be set out in a separate pleading. Please re-file as two(2) separate pleadings. (Lee, Lisa)
May 30, 2008 73 Defendant City of Durham, North Carolina's BRIEF re 72 MOTION to Dismiss. (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
May 30, 2008 72 MOTION to Dismiss by CITY OF DURHAM. Responses due by 8/28/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2) (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
May 30, 2008 71 BRIEF re 70 Answer to Complaint 's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (KYRE, KENNETH)
May 30, 2008 70 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by J. WESLEY COVINGTON. (KYRE, KENNETH)
May 30, 2008 69 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant MARK GOTTLIEB re 68 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum Supporting Mark Gottlieb's Motion to Dismiss filed by MARK GOTTLIEB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - application for Nontestimonial Identification Order, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Nontestimonial Identification Order, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Subpoena for Key Card Information) (SPEAS, EDWIN)
May 30, 2008 68 MOTION to Dismiss by MARK GOTTLIEB. Responses due by 6/23/2008 (SPEAS, EDWIN)
May 30, 2008 67 DEFENDANT BENJAMIN HIMAN'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISMISS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (SAPPENFIELD, HENRY)
May 30, 2008 66 MOTION to Dismiss by BENJAMIN HIMAN. Responses due by 6/23/2008 (SAPPENFIELD, HENRY)
May 30, 2008 65 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO re 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (GORELICK, JAMIE)
May 30, 2008 64 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO. Responses due by 8/28/2008 (GORELICK, JAMIE)
May 30, 2008 63 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY, RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU re 62 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY, RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(GORELICK, JAMIE)
May 30, 2008 62 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by DUKE UNIVERSITY, RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU. Responses due by 8/28/2008 (GORELICK, JAMIE)
May 30, 2008 61 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER. (KERNER, PATRICIA)
May 30, 2008 60 MOTION to Dismiss by PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER. Responses due by 8/28/2008 (KERNER, PATRICIA)
May 30, 2008 59 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant DAVID ADDISON re 58 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DAVID ADDISON. (MAXWELL, JAMES)
May 30, 2008 58 MOTION to Dismiss by DAVID ADDISON. Responses due by 6/23/2008 (MAXWELL, JAMES)
May 22, 2008 57 MOTION to Require Defendants to Participate in the Mandatory Rule 26(f) Discovery Conference; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (COOPER, CHARLES)
April 24, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings as to: LINWOOD WILSON answer due 6/27/2008. (Lee, Lisa)
April 23, 2008 Featured Case ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by LINWOOD WILSON. Answer must be filed no later than June 27, 2008. Signed by MAG/JUDGE WALLACE W. DIXON on 4/23/2008. (DIXON, WALLACE)
April 23, 2008 ***Motions Referred: 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to MAG/JUDGE WALLACE W. DIXON. (Kemp, Donita)
April 22, 2008 56 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HENRY W. SAPPENFIELD on behalf of Defendant BENJAMIN HIMAN (SAPPENFIELD, HENRY)
April 22, 2008 55 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint; filed by LINWOOD WILSON. Responses due by 5/15/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Envelope (Front)) (Lee, Lisa)
April 18, 2008 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT. The official transcript 54 Transcript has been filed in this case. The parties have five (5) business days to file with this court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due by 04/25/2008. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (Franklin, Grady)
April 18, 2008 54 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 15, 2008, before Judge Judge Beaty. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lori Russell, Telephone number 336-734-2547. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/17/2008. (Franklin, Grady)
April 15, 2008 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR: Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2008 re 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media filed by ROBERT DEAN, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, PETER LANGE, KATE HENDRICKS, TARA LEVICY, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, RICHARD BRODHEAD, THERESA ARICO, VICTOR DZAU, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TALLMAN TRASK, DUKE UNIVERSITY. (Attorneys Charles Cooper, David Thompson, William Thomas, Brian Koukoutchos, and Nicole Moss appeared on behalf of the plaintiffs; Attorneys Donald Cowan, Dixie Wells, Jennifer O'Connor, Cooper Harrell, Dan McLamb, Kenneth Kyre, Reginald Gillespie, Eric Stevens, Joel Craig, Patricia Kerner, and James Maxwell appeared on behalf of the defendants; For the reasons stated in open court, Defendants' Motion for Sanctions is hereby DENIED.) (Court Reporter Lori Russell.) (Kemp, Donita)
April 15, 2008 53 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THOMAS CARLTON YOUNGER, III on behalf of Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO (YOUNGER, THOMAS)
April 15, 2008 52 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SHIRLEY MARING PRUITT on behalf of Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO (PRUITT, SHIRLEY)
April 15, 2008 Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Responses due by 8/28/2008; Replies due by 9/29/2008; Motions/Answers due by 5/30/2008. (Lee, Lisa)
April 14, 2008 51 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 4/14/2008 GRANTING 50 Joint Motion to Extend Page Limitations and to Establish a Rule 12 Briefing Schedule. Motions/Answers due: May 30, 2008; Responses due: August 28, 2008; and Replies due: September 29, 2008. (Lee, Lisa)
April 11, 2008 ***Motions Submitted: 50 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and to Establish A Rule 12 Briefing Schedule to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR- (Powell, Gloria)
April 10, 2008 50 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and to Establish A Rule 12 Briefing Schedule by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Responses due by 5/5/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (COOPER, CHARLES)
April 10, 2008 49 REPLY BRIEF in Support of 35 Joinder in Duke Defendants' Motion re 10 Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media; filed by CITY OF DURHAM, MARK GOTTLIEB, BENJAMIN HIMAN, PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER, DAVID ADDISON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (GILLESPIE, REGINALD) Modified on 4/11/2008 to remove duplicate text. (Lee, Lisa).
April 8, 2008 48 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE as to LINWOOD WILSON served on 4/3/2008, answer due 4/23/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Return of Service) (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
April 7, 2008 47 RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 Response in Opposition to Motion, 40 Brief, 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media, 11 Memorandum; filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 4/24/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Disciplinary Hearing Commission's Order in 06-DAC35 (7-24-07)) (COOPER, CHARLES)
April 2, 2008 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
April 2, 2008 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. J. WESLEY COVINGTON waiver sent on 3/5/2008, answer due 5/5/2008. (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
April 2, 2008 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
April 2, 2008 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. CITY OF DURHAM waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; MARK GOTTLIEB waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; BENJAMIN HIMAN waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; PATRICK BAKER waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; STEVEN CHALMERS waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; RONALD HODGE waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; LEE RUSS waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; STEPHEN MIHAICH waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; BEVERLY COUNCIL waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; JEFF LAMB waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; MICHAEL RIPBERGER waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008; DAVID ADDISON waiver sent on 2/29/2008, answer due 4/29/2008. (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
April 2, 2008 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
April 2, 2008 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE of SUMMONS by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. DUKE UNIVERSITY waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; RICHARD BRODHEAD waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; PETER LANGE waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; LARRY MONETA waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; JOHN BURNESS waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; TALLMAN TRASK waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; SUZANNE WASIOLEK waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; MATTHEW DRUMMOND waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; AARON GRAVES waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; ROBERT DEAN waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; TARA LEVICY waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; THERESA ARICO waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; KATE HENDRICKS waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008; VICTOR DZAU waiver sent on 3/17/2008, answer due 5/16/2008. (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
March 25, 2008 40 Reply BRIEF in Support of the Duke Defendants' Motion Regarding Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Client Contact with Media - re 38 Response in Opposition to Motion, 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media, 11 Memorandum, filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (COWAN, JAMES)
March 18, 2008 Telephone Notice to Attorneys Cooper, Thomas, Cowan, McLamb, Kyre, Gillespie, Stevens, Craig, Kerner & Maxwell on 3/18/2008: Hearing on Motion Attorney-Initiated/Sanctioned Contact with Media set for 4/15/2008 02:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY JR. (Powell, Gloria)
March 17, 2008 39 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KENNETH KYRE, JR on behalf of Defendant J. WESLEY COVINGTON (KYRE, KENNETH)
March 14, 2008 ORAL ORDER per CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. on 3/14/2008 granting 28 Motion to Continue 3/20/2008 Hearing. Parties will be notified as to rescheduled date. (Powell, Gloria)
March 13, 2008 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media, 11 Memorandum,, filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Replies due by 3/31/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Change of Venue Motion in North Carolina v. Seligmann, # 2 Exhibit B - 12-18-07 Lacrosse Statement, # 3 Exhibit C - 10-12-07 Duke Press Release) (COOPER, CHARLES)
March 13, 2008 37 BRIEF re 35 MOTION Joinder in Duke Defendants' Motion re 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media MOTION Joinder in Duke Defendants' Motion re 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media. (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
March 13, 2008 36 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 35 MOTION Joinder in Duke Defendants' Motion re 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media MOTION Joinder in Duke Defendants' Motion re 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media filed by CITY OF DURHAM, MARK GOTTLIEB, BENJAMIN HIMAN, PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER, DAVID ADDISON. (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
March 13, 2008 35 MOTION Joinder in Duke Defendants' Motion re 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media by CITY OF DURHAM, MARK GOTTLIEB, BENJAMIN HIMAN, PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER, DAVID ADDISON. Responses due by 4/7/2008 (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
March 11, 2008 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney HANNAH GRAY STYRON on behalf of Defendants PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER (STYRON, HANNAH)
March 11, 2008 33 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney D. MARTIN WARF on behalf of Defendants PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER (WARF, D.)
March 11, 2008 ***Motions Submitted: 28 MOTION to Continue 3/20/08 Hearing to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR- (Powell, Gloria)
March 10, 2008 32 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PATRICIA P. KERNER on behalf of Defendants PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER (KERNER, PATRICIA)
March 7, 2008 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) re 29 Notice of Appearance of Brian Koukoutchos. Attorney Brian Koukoutchos is not a registered e-filer and cannot be added to the docket. Please complete CM/ECF Filer Registration form and submit to the Court. (Lee, Lisa)
March 7, 2008 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) re 27 Notice of Appearance of Nicole Jo Moss. Attorney Nicole Jo Moss in not a registered e-filer and cannot be added to the docket. Please complete CM/ECF Filer Registration form and submit to the Court. (Lee, Lisa)
March 6, 2008 29 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRIAN KOUKOUTCHOS on behalf of Plaintiffs KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS (COOPER, CHARLES)
March 6, 2008 28 MOTION to Continue by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. Responses due by 3/31/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (COOPER, CHARLES)
March 6, 2008 27 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney NICOLE JO MOSS on behalf of Plaintiffs KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS (COOPER, CHARLES) Modified on 3/7/2008 to add attorney's name (Lee, Lisa).
March 6, 2008 26 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ERIC P. STEVENS on behalf of Defendant MARK GOTTLIEB (STEVENS, ERIC)
March 6, 2008 25 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EDWIN M. SPEAS, JR on behalf of Defendant MARK GOTTLIEB (SPEAS, EDWIN)
March 6, 2008 24 NOTICE of Appearances by attorneys JENNIFER M. O'CONNOR, WILLIAM F. LEE, JAMIE GORELICK and PAUL R.Q. WOLFSON on behalf of Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU (O'CONNOR, JENNIFER) Modified on 3/7/2008 to add attornyes' names (Lee, Lisa).
March 5, 2008 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOEL MILLER CRAIG on behalf of Defendant BENJAMIN HIMAN (CRAIG, JOEL)
March 5, 2008 22 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES B. MAXWELL on behalf of Defendant DAVID ADDISON (MAXWELL, JAMES)
March 3, 2008 21 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAN JOHNSON MCLAMB on behalf of Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO (MCLAMB, DAN)
February 29, 2008 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney REGINALD B. GILLESPIE, JR on behalf of Defendant CITY OF DURHAM (GILLESPIE, REGINALD)
February 29, 2008 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JENNIFER M. O'CONNOR on behalf of Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY (O'CONNOR, JENNIFER)
February 29, 2008 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PAUL R.Q. WOLFSON on behalf of Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY (WOLFSON, PAUL)
February 29, 2008 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMIE S. GORELICK on behalf of Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY (GORELICK, JAMIE)
February 29, 2008 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney WILLIAM F. LEE on behalf of Defendant DUKE UNIVERSITY (LEE, WILLIAM)
February 29, 2008 15 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media: Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2008 02:00 PM in Winston-Salem Courtroom #1 before CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY JR.(Powell, Gloria)
February 29, 2008 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DIXIE THOMAS WELLS on behalf of Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY, RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU (WELLS, DIXIE)
February 29, 2008 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LESLIE COOPER HARRELL on behalf of Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY, RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU (HARRELL, LESLIE)
February 29, 2008 ***Motions Referred: 12 MOTION to Expedite Briefing of Motion Regarding Attorney Contact with Media, 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR- (Powell, Gloria)
February 29, 2008 12 MOTION to Expedite Briefing of Motion Regarding Attorney Contact with Media by DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU. (COWAN, JAMES)
February 28, 2008 11 MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU re 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media filed by DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU. (COWAN, JAMES)
February 28, 2008 10 MOTION Attorney-Initiated and Attorney-Sanctioned Contact with Media by DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU. Responses due by 3/24/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Media Alert, # 2 Exhibit 2 - www.dukelawsuit.com, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Gorelick/Cooper emails, # 4 Exhibit 4 - News Release, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Case Summary, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Transcript, # 7 Exhibit 7 part 1 - www.bork.com, # 8 Exhibit 7 part 2 - www.bork.com, # 9 Exhibit 8 - Bork E-brochure, # 10 Exhibit 9 - Bernard Statement, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Caswell Declaration)(COWAN, JAMES)
February 28, 2008 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DAVID H. THOMPSON on behalf of Plaintiffs KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS (THOMPSON, DAVID)
February 28, 2008 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHARLES J. COOPER on behalf of Plaintiffs KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS (COOPER, CHARLES)
February 25, 2008 7 Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (McClain, Abby)
February 25, 2008 6 Summons Issued as to DUKE UNIVERSITY, DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., RICHARD BRODHEAD, PETER LANGE, LARRY MONETA, JOHN BURNESS, TALLMAN TRASK, SUZANNE WASIOLEK, MATTHEW DRUMMOND, AARON GRAVES, ROBERT DEAN, TARA LEVICY, THERESA ARICO, J. WESLEY COVINGTON, KATE HENDRICKS, VICTOR DZAU, CITY OF DURHAM, LINWOOD WILSON, MARK GOTTLIEB, BENJAMIN HIMAN, PATRICK BAKER, STEVEN CHALMERS, RONALD HODGE, LEE RUSS, STEPHEN MIHAICH, BEVERLY COUNCIL, JEFF LAMB, MICHAEL RIPBERGER, DAVID ADDISON. (McClain, Abby)
February 21, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website form directory for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (McClain, Abby)
February 21, 2008 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document. RE 1 Complaint (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
February 21, 2008 4 Additional Attachments to Main Document. RE 1 Complaint (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
February 21, 2008 3 Additional Attachments to Main Document. RE 1 Complaint (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
February 21, 2008 2 Additional Attachments to Main Document. RE 1 Complaint (THOMAS, WILLIAM)
February 21, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by KYLE DOWD, PATRICIA DOWD, DANIEL FLANNERY, RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY, ZACHARY GREER, IRENE GREER, ERIK S. HENKELMAN, STEVEN W. HENKELMAN, JOHN E. JENNISON, BEN KOESTERER, EDWARD CARRINGTON, MARK KOESTERER, JOYCE KOESTERER, FRED KROM, PETER J. LAMADE, ADAM LANGLEY, CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS, DANIEL LOFTUS, BARBARA LOFTUS, ANTHONY MCDEVITT, GLENN NICK, CASEY J. CARROLL, NICHOLAS O'HARA, LYNNDA O'HARA, DANIEL OPPEDISANO, SAM PAYTON, JOHN BRADLEY ROSS, KENNETH SAUER, III, STEVE SCHOEFFEL, ROBERT SCHROEDER, DEVON SHERWOOD, DANIEL THEODORIDIS, MICHAEL P. CATALINO, BRET THOMPSON, CHRISTOPHER TKAC, TRACY TKAC, JOHN WALSH, JR, MICHAEL WARD, ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV, WILLIAM WOLCOTT, MICHAEL YOUNG, GALE CATALINO, THOMAS V. CLUTE, KEVIN COLEMAN, JOSHUA R. COVELESKI, EDWARD J. CROTTY, EDWARD S. DOUGLAS. (Filing Fee $350.00, Receipt# 04180000000000419425) (Attachments: # 1 Additional Documents)(THOMAS, WILLIAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CARRINGTON et al v. DUKE UNIVERSITY et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD CARRINGTON
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASEY J. CARROLL
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL P. CATALINO
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALE CATALINO
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS V. CLUTE
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN COLEMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA R. COVELESKI
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD J. CROTTY
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD S. DOUGLAS
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLE DOWD
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA DOWD
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL FLANNERY
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD GIBBS FOGARTY
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZACHARY GREER
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRENE GREER
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK S. HENKELMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN W. HENKELMAN
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN E. JENNISON
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEN KOESTERER
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK KOESTERER
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE KOESTERER
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED KROM
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER J. LAMADE
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM LANGLEY
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER LOFTUS
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL LOFTUS
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA LOFTUS
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY MCDEVITT
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENN NICK
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS O'HARA
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNNDA O'HARA
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL OPPEDISANO
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAM PAYTON
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN BRADLEY ROSS
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH SAUER, III
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE SCHOEFFEL
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SCHROEDER
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVON SHERWOOD
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL THEODORIDIS
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRET THOMPSON
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER TKAC
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY TKAC
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WALSH, JR.
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL WARD
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT H. WELLINGTON, IV
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM WOLCOTT
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL YOUNG
Represented By: WILLIAM JOHN THOMAS, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUKE UNIVERSITY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DUKE UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD BRODHEAD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER LANGE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY MONETA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BURNESS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TALLMAN TRASK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUZANNE WASIOLEK
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW DRUMMOND
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON GRAVES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT DEAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARA LEVICY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THERESA ARICO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. WESLEY COVINGTON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATE HENDRICKS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR DZAU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF DURHAM
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINWOOD WILSON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK GOTTLIEB
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BENJAMIN HIMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK BAKER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN CHALMERS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD HODGE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEE RUSS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MIHAICH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEVERLY COUNCIL
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF LAMB
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL RIPBERGER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ADDISON
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]