CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. v. LAETTNER, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.
Defendant: CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, THOMAS NIEMANN and BRIAN K. DAVIS
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv00232
Filed: April 2, 2009
 
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
County: Durham
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: JAMES A. BEATY
Referring Judge: P. TREVOR SHARP
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2010 32 JUDGMENT signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 9/22/10, that the plaintiff, Chevron U.S.A. Inc. ("CUSA"), shall recover of the defendants, Christian Laettner ("Laettner") and Brian K. Davis ("Davis"), judgment in the amount of $2,263,974, inclusive of interest and costs. Execution on this judgment may issue forthwith in the full amount of $2,263,974 without prior notice to Laettner and Davis. In light of this Judgment, the previous Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. # 23 ] filed by CUSA is dismissed as moot. (Law, Trina)
September 2, 2010 Motions Submitted: 31 Consent MOTION for Judgment to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. (Kemp, Donita)
September 1, 2010 31 Consent MOTION for Judgment by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. Responses due by 9/27/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
August 2, 2010 30 STIPULATION for Compromise Settlement Agreement for Judgment. (MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
March 4, 2010 29 Featured Case ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR on 3/4/10, that the Motion for Entry of Six-Month Dismissal Nisi as to Defendants Laettner and Davis [Doc. # 28 ] will be construed as a Motion to Stay this Proceeding for Six Months, and the Motion to Stay will be GRANTED. THEREFORE this case is hereby stayed until September 1, 2010. (Law, Trina)
February 27, 2010 Motions Submitted: 28 JOINT MOTION For Entry of Six-Month Dismissal Nisi of Defendants Laettner and Davis to CHIEF JUDGE JAMES A. BEATY, JR. (Kemp, Donita)
February 22, 2010 NOTICE to Attorney Benjamin McGovern via email requesting a Proposed Order as to pleading #28, Joint Motion for Entry of Six-Month Dismissal Nisi of defendants Laettner and Davis. (Kemp, Donita)
February 17, 2010 28 JOINT MOTION For Entry of Six-Month Dismissal Nisi of Defendants Laettner and Davis by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
January 19, 2010 27 CERTIFICATE re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 24 Memorandum, 25 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 26 Affidavit in Support of Motion by Plaintiff CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
January 19, 2010 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) as to BENJAMIN M. MCGOVERN re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 24 Memorandum. Documents fail to include a Certificate of Service. Please file "Certificate of Service" as to all parties. (Law, Trina)
January 15, 2010 26 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
January 15, 2010 25 AFFIDAVIT in Support re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
January 15, 2010 24 MEMORANDUM re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
January 15, 2010 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. Responses due by 2/17/2010. (MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
January 12, 2010 Reset Deadline: Stipulation of Dismissal due by 2/12/2010. (Kemp, Donita)
January 8, 2010 22 STATUS MEMORANDUM re Letter to Court requesting telephonic status conference by Plaintiff CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
December 29, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines : Stipulation of Dismissal due by 1/29/2010. (Gammon, Cheryl)
December 29, 2009 Case Reported Settled at Mediation (Gammon, Cheryl)
December 22, 2009 21 NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Plaintiff CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (BOUCHARD, MATTHEW)
November 11, 2009 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ROBIN KENTON VINSON on behalf of Defendant THOMAS NIEMANN. (VINSON, ROBIN)
September 14, 2009 19 NOTICE of Hearing: Bench Trial set for 7/5/2010 09:30 AM in Unassigned Courtroom; Trial Briefs, etc. deadline set for 6/15/2010.(Kemp, Donita)
August 25, 2009 18 Featured Case ORDER Appointing RICHARD T. BOYETTE as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl)
August 24, 2009 MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER ; Mediation due by 12/19/2009. (Gammon, Cheryl)
August 19, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE P. TREVOR SHARP on 08/19/09, granting 16 JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT submitted by the parties. The Report is approved without modification. Discovery due by 12/19/2009. Discovery shall be placed on a case-management track established as: Standard. The parties agree that the mediator shall be Richard T. Boyette. The parties do not anticipate joining any additional parties or amending their respective pleadings. Trial of the action is expected to take approximately two (2) days. A jury trial has not been demanded. (Law, Trina)
August 18, 2009 ***Motions Referred: 16 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties to MAG/JUDGE P. TREVOR SHARP- (Garrett, Kim)
August 17, 2009 16 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC., CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, THOMAS NIEMANN, BRIAN K. DAVIS.(MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
June 30, 2009 15 NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 8/31/2009 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE P. TREVOR SHARP. (Garrett, Kim)
June 29, 2009 14 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by THOMAS NIEMANN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended and Restated Promissory Note, # 2 Exhibit January 23, 2007 letter, # 3 Exhibit Agreement Concerning Chesterfield Building, # 4 Exhibit April 16, 2008 letter)(FISHER, TERRY)
June 26, 2009 13 Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint by CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(CARPENTER, CHARLES)
June 5, 2009 11 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE P. TREVOR SHARP on 06/05/09, that Defendant's motion (Docket No. 9 ) is GRANTED and that Defendant Niemann shall have up to and including June 18, 2009, within which to file the answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint in the above-entitled cause. Answer due by 6/18/2009. (Law, Trina)
June 5, 2009 10 Featured Case ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE P. TREVOR SHARP on 06/05/09, that Defendants' motion (Docket No. 8 ) is GRANTED and that Defendants Laettner and Davis shall have up to and including June 18, 2009, within which to file the answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint in the above-entitled cause. Answer due by 6/18/2009. (Law, Trina)
June 3, 2009 ***Motions Referred: 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to MAG/JUDGE P. TREVOR SHARP. (Kemp, Donita)
June 2, 2009 ***Motions Referred: 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to MAG/JUDGE P. TREVOR SHARP. (Kemp, Donita)
June 1, 2009 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by THOMAS NIEMANN. Responses due by 6/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(FISHER, TERRY)
May 28, 2009 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, BRIAN K. DAVIS. Responses due by 6/18/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CARPENTER, CHARLES)
May 13, 2009 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSHUA C. KRUMHOLZ on behalf of Plaintiff CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (KRUMHOLZ, JOSHUA)
May 13, 2009 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BENJAMIN M. MCGOVERN on behalf of Plaintiff CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (MCGOVERN, BENJAMIN)
May 5, 2009 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. THOMAS NIEMANN waiver sent on 4/3/2009, answer due 6/2/2009. (BOUCHARD, MATTHEW)
May 4, 2009 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. BRIAN K. DAVIS waiver sent on 4/3/2009, answer due 6/2/2009. (BOUCHARD, MATTHEW)
May 4, 2009 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. CHRISTIAN LAETTNER waiver sent on 4/3/2009, answer due 6/2/2009. (BOUCHARD, MATTHEW)
April 2, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Standing Order 30 (McClain, Abby)
April 2, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website form directory for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (McClain, Abby)
April 2, 2009 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. (BOUCHARD, MATTHEW)
April 2, 2009 1 COMPLAINT against CHRISTIAN LAETTNER, THOMAS NIEMANN, BRIAN K. DAVIS ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 04180000000000590063.), filed by CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(BOUCHARD, MATTHEW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC. v. LAETTNER, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.
Represented By: MATTHEW C. BOUCHARD
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN LAETTNER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS NIEMANN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN K. DAVIS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]