J&J SPORTS PRODUCTIONS, INC. v. SANTILLAN, et al

Defendant: LUCIA SANTILLAN and LA REGIA CORP.
Plaintiff: J&J SPORTS PRODUCTIONS, INC.
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv01141
Filed: December 27, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Middle District Court
Office: NCMD Office
County: Durham
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Referring Judge: P. TREVOR SHARP
 
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2012 16 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 7/11/2012; that Defendant Lucia Santillan's Motion for Relief from the Entry of Default is GRANTED. Defendant Santillan shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 18, 2012. (Sheets, Jamie)
December 28, 2012 21 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD signed on 12/28/2012, recommending that Defendant Lucia Santillan's Motion to Dismiss (Docket Entry 17 ) be granted in part and denied in part, in that the Court should dismiss the claim of conversion with prejudice, but should permit Plaintiff to amend the Cable Act claims. (Daniel, J)
January 17, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER signed by JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER on 1/17/2013 ADOPTING the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 21 ; that Defendant Lucia Santillan's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 17 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, in that the court dismisses the claim of conversion with prejudice, but permits Plaintiff to amend the Cable Act claims. (Sheets, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: J&J SPORTS PRODUCTIONS, INC. v. SANTILLAN, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUCIA SANTILLAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA REGIA CORP.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&J SPORTS PRODUCTIONS, INC.
Represented By: JEREMY TODD BROWNER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]