United States of America v. Real Property in Swannanoa, NC

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property in Swannanoa, North Carolina
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv00078
Filed: February 24, 2007
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Lacy Thornburg
 
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Food and Drug
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property - Real Estate
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that counsel for the respective parties file a joint status report not later than September 18, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on September 10, 2009. (jhg)
March 14, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the government shall file a status report and any appropriate motion not later than Friday, March 25, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on March 14, 2011. (jhg)
May 3, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on May 2, 2011. (jhg)
May 3, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/2/2011. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on May 3, 2011. (jhg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property in Swannanoa, NC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas R Ascik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property in Swannanoa, North Carolina
Represented By: Jack W. Stewart, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]