Metheny et al v. Prime Carolina, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Glenn Leo Metheny and Katherine Privett Metheny
Defendant: Prime Carolina, LLC and Dan Grammatico Signature Homes, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00093
Filed: March 18, 2008
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: Buncombe
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Lacy Thornburg
 
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 33:1365 Environmental Matters

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE STATUS ORDER that third-party defendant Civil Design Concepts, P.A.s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (#66) is STAYED, and the remaining parties shall file a joint status report outlining a proposed plan for disposition of this case, or a motion to stay the remainder of the case, not later than September 25, 2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/10/09. (siw)
September 28, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Motion to Stay, and all deadlines contained in the Second Amended Pretrial Order are STAYED pending review of the Proposed Consent Decree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/28/09. (siw)
November 30, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/30/09. (siw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Metheny et al v. Prime Carolina, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Leo Metheny
Represented By: Gary Allen Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Privett Metheny
Represented By: Gary Allen Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Carolina, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Grammatico Signature Homes, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]