United States of America v. 3039.375 Pounds of Copper Coins et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 3039.375 Pounds of Copper Coins, 5930.32 Troy Ounces of Silver Coins, 63.24 Troy Ounces of Gold Coins, 3 Platinum Coins, 168,599 Silver Troy Ounce Coins, 147 Gold Troy Ounce Coins, 710 Silver .5 Troy Ounce Coins, 11 Silver Bars and Silver Scrap Totaling 10,720.60 Troy Ounces, 1000.5 Troy Ounces of Silver Coins, Dies, Molds, Casts, 16,000.05 Troy Ounces of Raw Silver, 100 Ounces of Copper Coins, $254,424.09 in United States Currency and 17 Gold .05 Troy Ounce Coins
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00230
Filed: May 29, 2008
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Forfeit/Penalty: Other Office
County: Buncombe
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Lacy Thornburg
 
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 21:0881 Property Forfeiture

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert J. Stienjes for William H Wesson, Karl Reile, Gerhard Reile, Janet Lee Meisinger, Shelter Systems, LLC, Dave Gillie, Jeff Kotchounian, Alan McConnell, Mary S Nothhouse, Tom Olmsted, Dan Morrow, Matt Pitagora, Daniel Priest, Vernon Robinson and Bernard von NotHaus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on September 15, 2008. (jhg)
October 21, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Unseal Case; granting 36 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on October 21, 2008. (jhg)
July 15, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Dismiss; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Layman is afforded 15 days from entry of this Order in which to file an answer in compliance with Rule G of the Supplemental Rules for Asset Forfeiture Actio ns. The Court respectfully refers the Governments Motion to Extend Stay and related pleadings to the Magistrate Judge for disposition. terminating 47 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Lacy Thornburg on 07/15/2009. (thh)
July 20, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the governments Motion to Extend Stay Beyond June 20, 2009 Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 981(g)(1) (#50) is GRANTED, and discovery as well as all other proceedings in this civil matter are STAYED for an additional si x months, at which time such stay shall automatically dissolve unless the government can show by motion (accompanied by a status report) reasons whythe stay should not be lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on July 20, 2009. (jhg)
January 21, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Stay and discovery as well as all other proceedings in this civil matter are STAYED for an additional six months, at which time such stay shall automatically dissolve unless the government can show by motion (accompanied by a status report) reasons why the stay should not be lifted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/21/10. (emw)
July 7, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to stay up to and inclusive of 01/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/07/2010. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
January 28, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion to Stay. This civil matter are STAYED up to and inclusive of June 10, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/28/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
June 29, 2011 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion to Stay and discovery as well as all other proceedings in this civil matter are STAYED up to and inclusive of December 10, 2011, at which time such stay shall automatically dissolve unless the Government can show by motion (accompanied by a status report) reasons why the stay should not be lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 06/29/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
December 28, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion to Stay and discovery as well as all other proceedings in this civil matter are STAYED until sixty (60) days after the Court has issued its rulings on the issues of new trial or acquittal and of forfeiture and sentenced defendant Von NotHaus in 5:09cr27.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/28/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. 3039.375 Pounds of Copper Coins et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas R Ascik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3039.375 Pounds of Copper Coins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5930.32 Troy Ounces of Silver Coins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 63.24 Troy Ounces of Gold Coins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Platinum Coins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 168,599 Silver Troy Ounce Coins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 147 Gold Troy Ounce Coins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 710 Silver .5 Troy Ounce Coins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11 Silver Bars and Silver Scrap Totaling 10,720.60 Troy Ounces
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1000.5 Troy Ounces of Silver Coins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dies, Molds, Casts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16,000.05 Troy Ounces of Raw Silver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 100 Ounces of Copper Coins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $254,424.09 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17 Gold .05 Troy Ounce Coins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]