Zep Inc. v. Midwest Motor Supply Co. et al

Plaintiff: Zep Inc.
Defendant: Midwest Motor Supply Co., Steven Lave, Samuel Trantham and John Thomas Belk
 
Case Number: 1:2008cv00550
Filed: December 22, 2008
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: XX, Outside State
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Lacy Thornburg
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2009 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion to Change Venue and the case of Zep, Inc. v. Midwest Motor Supply Co. d/b/a Kimball Midwest and John Thomas Belk is RE-SEVERED and transferred to the Charlotte Division of the Western District of North Carolina with asepar ate docket number; the case of Zep, Inc. v. Midwest Motor Supply Co. d/b/a Kimball Midwest, Steven Lave, and Samuel Trantham is RETAINED in theAsheville Division of this court and shall proceed under docket number 1:08cv550;. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/07/09. (emw)
January 26, 2009 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Megan K. Ouzts for Zep Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/26/09. (ejb)
January 26, 2009 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 37 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David E. Gevertz for Zep Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/26/09. (ejb)
February 12, 2009 46 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Steven Lave, Samuel Trantham, Midwest Motor Supply Co. Objections to M&R due by 3/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/12/09. (emw)
March 11, 2009 55 Featured Case ORDER Consolidating Cases for Trial. All further pleadings to be docketed to: 1:08cv550. Member Case: 3:09cv5 to be administratively closed. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 03/10/2009. (thh)
August 4, 2009 80 Featured Case ORDER denying 74 Motion to Retransfer case back to the Southern District of Ohio. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 08/04/2009. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zep Inc. v. Midwest Motor Supply Co. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zep Inc.
Represented By: James D. Kurek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Motor Supply Co.
Represented By: Willis Irl Reasoner, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lave
Represented By: Willis Irl Reasoner, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Trantham
Represented By: Willis Irl Reasoner, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thomas Belk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]