SunTrust Bank v. 890 Hendersonville Road, LLC et al

Plaintiff: SunTrust Bank
Defendant: 890 Hendersonville Road, LLC, Joe C Brumit, II, Charles D Owen, III and Gregory A Edney
Case Number: 1:2010cv00050
Filed: February 24, 2010
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 27, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: CARDEN NOTICE - that plaintiff file and serve a Notice of Citizenship of LLC Defendant not later than June 11, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/27/10. (emw)
July 7, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss and Defendants Brumits and Owens Memorandum in Response is STRICKEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/07/2010. (thh)
April 5, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within ten (10) days of the entry of this Order that the Plaintiff shall file its motion for default judgment as against Defendant Edney, or dismiss said claim or take such other action as to move toward a final res olution of said claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order that the parties shall file their Stipulation of Dismissal of all otherclaims herein. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/04/11. (emw)
May 4, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Gregory A. Edney. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 5/4/2011. (thh)
April 20, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by clerk on 04/20/2010. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SunTrust Bank v. 890 Hendersonville Road, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Matthew P. Weiner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 890 Hendersonville Road, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe C Brumit, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D Owen, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory A Edney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]