Bettis v. Madison County Sheriff's Department et al

Defendant: Madison County Sheriff's Department and Buddy Harwood
Plaintiff: Henry H. Bettis, III
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00069
Filed: March 23, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion for TRO; denying 13 Motion for Discovery; denying 14 Motion for TRO; denying 17 Motion for TRO; with the exception of Pltfs retaliatory transfer claim against Deft Harwood, Pltfs amended claims are DENIED and DISMISSED. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/4/10. (ejb)
June 7, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all dispositive motions must be filed with the Court within sixty days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/7/10. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jhg)
January 10, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants shall file the motion and any supporting brief separately within thirty (30) days of the filing of this Order re 16 Motion contained in Answer to Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on January 10, 2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jhg)
September 29, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner has thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order to file his response, including any evidence, to the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment.. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/28/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(pdf)
January 19, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Deft's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. on 1/19/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
January 19, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 1/19/2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 1/19/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
March 26, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall issue summons and deliver it forthwith to the U. S. Marshal who will make service of process without additional cost.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/26/2010. (pdf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Bettis v. Madison County Sheriff's Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison County Sheriff's Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buddy Harwood
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry H. Bettis, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]