Carolina First Bank v. Stambaugh et al

Plaintiff: Carolina First Bank
Defendant: Charles Stambaugh and Camilla Stambaugh
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv00174
Filed: August 19, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1819
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 11 Motion to Forego Mediation or Attend Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on January 31, 2011. (jhg)
July 12, 2011 25 Featured Case ORDER denying 16 Motion to Compel; denying 19 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on July 12, 2011. (jhg)
September 6, 2011 38 Featured Case ORDER denying 33 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/6/11. (siw)
August 23, 2010 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles L. Stambaugh for Camilla Stambaugh & Charles Stambaugh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/23/10. (ejb)
September 26, 2011 40 Featured Case ORDER terminating re 27 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision (Rule 72(a)) re 25 Order on Motion to Compel, Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/26/2011. (pdf)
December 14, 2011 41 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 22 Pltf's Motion for Summary Judgment; Defts' counterclaim is DISMISSED; and judgment is entered in favor of Pltf against Defts in the amount of $328,274.40 plus inte rest at the rate of $34.08 per day from and after 6/30/2011, plus an award of attys' fees in the amount of $50,375.20; and denying 21 Defts' Motion for Summary Judgment on Affirmative Defense of Laches. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/13/11. (ejb)
December 14, 2011 42 Featured Case JUDGMENT in favor of Carolina First Bank against Camilla Stambaugh, Charles Stambaugh. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/13/11. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carolina First Bank v. Stambaugh et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolina First Bank
Represented By: Lance Paul Martin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Stambaugh
Represented By: Sherri Lynn Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camilla Stambaugh
Represented By: Sherri Lynn Brewer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]