Synovus Bank v. Greer et al

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Robert J. Greer and Joanne P. Greer
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00026
Filed: February 7, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2011 12 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Pltf. against Joanne P. Greer, Robert J. Greer. (nll)
July 3, 2012 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion to Vacate Judgment and for Leave to Amend Complaint, and 8 Clerk's Entry of Default, 12 Default Judgment are hereby VACATED; and Pltf shall file an Amended Complaint reflecting its revised calculations within 14 days of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/3/12. (ejb)
January 7, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion 21 is GRANTED, and the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant Robert J. Greer are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. re 21 MOTION to Dismiss claims against Defendant Robert J. Greer. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/04/2013. (thh)
January 7, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER that the Show Cause Order 19 is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/04/2013. (thh)
January 14, 2013 28 Featured Case DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Synovus Bank against Joanne P. Greer. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 1/14/13. (nll) Modified text on 1/14/2013 (ejb).
March 14, 2011 6 Featured Case ORDER Pltf. file an appropriate motion or take further action to move this case forward not later than 3/25/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/14/11. (ejb)
June 10, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER Pltf. file an appropriate motion or take further action with respect to this matter no later than 7/5/11. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/10/11. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Greer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Greer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne P. Greer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]