Synovus Bank v. Coleman

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Patrick Coleman
Case Number: 1:2011cv00066
Filed: April 1, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 11 Motion to Strike & 13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/8/11. (nll)
November 23, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 26 Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims; denying as moot 34 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 38 Motion to Dismiss Amended Third Party Claims; granting 47 Motion to Amend/Correct; Defendant shall file his Second Amended Answer by 12/7/11; Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days from the filing of the Second Amended Answer to answer or otherwise respond to any counterclaims or third-party claims asserted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/22/11. (nll) Modified text on 11/23/2011 (nll). NEF Regenerated.
January 23, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/23/2012. (thh)
August 15, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 58 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall conduct an initial attorneys' conference withi n fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order and shall file a Certificate of Initial Attorneys' Conference within seven (7) days thereafter. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/12. (nll) Modified on 8/15/2012 (nll).
March 27, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added T. William McGee, III for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/27/13. (nll)
April 9, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Timothy Ryan Langley for Patrick Coleman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/9/13. (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Coleman
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]