Synovus Bank v. Maurer

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Judson Maurer
Case Number: 1:2011cv00068
Filed: April 1, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims & 10 Motion to Strike Answer to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/2/11. (ejb)
November 23, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Deft's Motion to Amend/Correct 15 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint, Deft shall file his Second Amended Answer by 12/7/2011; denying as moot 26 Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims, 32 Motion to Strike Answer, and 36 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Claims. Pltf shall have 20 days from filing of Second Amended Answer to answer or otherwise respond to any counterclaims or third-party claims asserted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Hwell on 11/22/11. (ejb)
August 15, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 54 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Dismiss; parties to conduct an initial attorneys' conference within 14 days. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail with this order & Coleman Order.)(ejb)
October 17, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Pretrial ORDER and Case Management Plan re 70 Scheduling Order, amended to provide trial be scheduled on the 1st session on or after 9/9/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/16/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Maurer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judson Maurer
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]