Synovus Bank v. Bokke IV, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Bokke IV, LLC, James Eley, Laura Kelly, John Kelly, Sr., Marlon Niemand, Mark P. Kelly, John G. Reckenbeil and Simon Mannion
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00071
Filed: April 1, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2013 100 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/11/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
October 1, 2013 125 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion to Strike and Motion for Entry of Default (see order for details); denying as moot 106 Motion for Sanctions; denying without prejudice 108 Motion to Compel and [11 7] Motion to Compel supplemented. This action is STAYED until further Order of the Court with respect to Defendant James Eley only. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal with respect to the settled claims within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/01/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
December 3, 2013 139 Featured Case ROSEBORO ORDER re 123 MOTION for Summary Judgment , ( Responses due by 12/18/2013). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/03/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
February 4, 2014 153 Featured Case ORDER granting 135 Motion to Dismiss and the Bank's claims against the Kelly Defendants and the Kelly Defendants' claims against the Third Party Defendants are all DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/04/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
February 4, 2014 155 Featured Case ORDER that within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order, the Bankruptcy Trustee shall file a report regarding his determination regarding the prosecution of the third-party claims asserted by Defendant Eley in this action. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/04/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
March 5, 2014 166 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal of all claims pending among the Plaintiff, Defendant Reckenbeil, and the Third-Party Defendants within 30 days of the entry of this Order; ORDER GRANTING WITHOUT PRE JUDICE Defendant Niemand's oral motion for dismissal of claims against Third-Party Defendants; granting 137 Motion for Entry of Judgment as to Defendant Niemand; denying as moot 157 , 158 Motions in Limine; denying as moot 159 Motion to Appoint Expert. This matter is hereby CONTINUED from the March 10, 2014 trial term to be reset at a later date. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/4/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm) Modified text on 3/5/2014 (khm).
March 5, 2014 169 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT as to Marlon Niemand is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/5/14. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
March 6, 2014 171 Featured Case ORDER that the stay of this action is lifted with respect to Defendant Eley's third-party claims only. This action remains stayed with respect to the Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED t hat within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this Order, Defendant Eley shall advise the Court in writing whether he intends to pursue these third-party claims. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/06/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
March 10, 2014 172 Featured Case ORDER granting 167 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Bokke IV L.L.C. and Simon Mannion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all counterclaims and third-party claims asserted by Defendants Bokke IV, L.L.C. and Simon Mannion are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/8/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg) Modified text on 3/10/2014 (tmg).
March 10, 2014 173 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT as to Defendants Bokke IV, L.L.C. and Simon Mannion is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated March 10, 2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
March 24, 2014 176 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 175 Defendant Eley's motion to dismiss, and the third-party claims asserted by Defendant Eley in this action are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/24/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
August 2, 2011 26 Featured Case ORDER Denying as moot 17 Motion to Strike Answer to Complaint and 19 Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/02/11. (emw)
November 23, 2011 55 Featured Case ORDER granting 52 Motion to Amend Answer to Complaint. Defendants shall file their Second Amended Answer by December 7, 2011. The Court DENIES as moot 32 Motion to Dismiss, 39 Motion to Strike and 43 Motion to Dis miss. Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days from the filing of the Second Amended Answer to answer or otherwise respond to any counterclaims or third-party claims asserted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/22/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
August 15, 2012 69 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 61 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Dismiss; parties to conduct an initial attorneys' conference within 14 days. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail with this Order & Coleman Order.)(ejb)
March 13, 2013 86 Featured Case ORDER denying Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Present Consolidated Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Synovus Bank (Doc. 77 filed in case no. 1:11cv66). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/12/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nll)
March 15, 2013 87 Featured Case ORDER that attorney David R. Payne and attorney John Elliott Rogers, II are to provide to the Clerk the address for defendants John Kelly, Laura Kelly, and Mark Kelly on or beforeMarch 22, 2013. re 80 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/14/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
March 26, 2013 93 Featured Case ORDER The Court now GRANTS attorneys John Rogers and David Payne leave to withdraw as attorneys of record in this case for Defendants Bokke, IV, LLC,Marlon Niemand, and James Eley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/25/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
March 27, 2013 94 Featured Case ORDER granting 92 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added T. William McGee, III for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/27/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Bokke IV, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bokke IV, LLC
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Eley
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Kelly
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kelly, Sr.
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlon Niemand
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark P. Kelly
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Reckenbeil
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Mannion
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]