Synovus Bank v. Frank

Defendant: Timothy T. Frank
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Case Number: 1:2011cv00165
Filed: July 8, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion to Stay this case until 12/21/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/28/11. (ejb)
December 22, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER after consultation with the parties, the Court EXTENDS the Stay previously set in this case until 2/1/2012 re 16 Order on Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/21/11. (ejb)
February 8, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order re 18 Case Settlement Notice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/07/2012. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy T. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.