Synovus Bank v. Pierce

Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Defendant: Lonell G. Pierce
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00190
Filed: July 29, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 22 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 14 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss; parties to conduct an initial attorneys' conference within 14 days. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/12. (ejb)
March 13, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER denying Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Present Consolidated Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Synovus Bank (Doc. 77 filed in case no. 1:11cv66). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/12/13. (nll)
March 27, 2013 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added T. William McGee, III for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/27/13. (ejb)
April 9, 2013 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Timothy Ryan Langley for Lonell G. Pierce. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 04/09/13. (emw)
April 26, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall have thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order in which to file a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/25/13. (emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: W. Carleton Metcalf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonell G. Pierce
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]