Synovus Bank v. Okay Properties, LLC et al

Defendant: Okay Properties, LLC and William O'Donnell, Jr.
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00330
Filed: December 8, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 7 Plaintiff Synovus Bank's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims and 8 Third Party Defendant Synovus Financial's Motion to Dismiss Third Party Claims; granting 11 Plaintiff Synovus Bank's M otion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims; and 12 Third Party Defendant SynovusFinancial Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Third Party Claims. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/27/2012. (thh)
March 13, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER denying Motion for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Present Consolidated Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission by Synovus Bank (Doc. 77 filed in case no. 1:11cv66). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/12/13. (nll)
March 27, 2013 30 Featured Case ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added T. William McGee, III for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/27/13. (ejb)
June 11, 2013 32 Featured Case ORDER the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 30 days of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/10/13. (ejb)
July 11, 2013 34 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/11/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Okay Properties, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Okay Properties, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William O'Donnell, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Steven Brent McFarland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]