United States of America v. $28,182,00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $28,182,00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Artie Smith
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00008
Filed: January 20, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cleveland
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to referral from the District Court and also pursuant to a Response and Opposition to Motion re 15 Response in Opposition to Motion. ( Status Conference set for 8/14/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/01/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
August 31, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/30/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
October 22, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER parties instructed to file a Certification of Initial Attorney's Conference on or before 10/26/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/19/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
February 6, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/6/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
March 14, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Compel. Claimant Smith shall respond to the Governments discovery requests by April 1, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/13/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
May 8, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Gov's 36 Motion for Default Judgment, granting motion to extent it seeks imposition of sanctions and denying motion to extent it seeks entry of default judgment; Claimant Smit h ordered to pay a fine of $1000.00 into the registry of the Court by 6/1/13, and Claimant Smith to respond to each and every one of the Gov's discovery requests by 6/1/13; Court DENIES any motion contained in Claimant Smith's 38 Response to the Gov's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/7/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
July 8, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER accepting 43 Memorandum and Recommendations; striking 25 Amended Answer of Claimant Artie Smith; granting 42 Renewed Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against Claim of Artie Smith. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/5/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
July 10, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of United States of America against Artie Smith is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/8/13. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
August 12, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT, ENTRY OF JUDGMENT, AND FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE in favor of United States of America against $28,182.00 in United States Currency and all persons and entities of the world; and Deft. Property $28,182.00 in US Currency is hereby forfeited to United States. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/12/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb) Modified text on 8/12/2013 (ejb). NEF Regenerated.
March 5, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 4 "Statement of Interest" filed by Artie Smith: Artie Smith shall file a verification of his petition within 14 days of entry of this Order. Claimant advised failure to file the required verification will result in the dismissal of his petition. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/5/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
March 20, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Claimant Artie Smith shall serve and file an answer to the Government's Complaint or a motion under Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on or before April 5, 2012. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/19/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. $28,182,00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas R. Ascik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $28,182,00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Artie Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]