Queen v. Haywood Regional Medical Center et al

Defendant: Westcare, Inc., Haywood Regional Medical Center Medical Care Plan, Haywood Regional Medical Center Employee Benefit Plan-Life Insurance, Haywood Regional Medical Center, a Hospital Authority, Haywood Regional Medical Center and Medwest Health System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Julia A. Queen
Case Number: 1:2012cv00306
Filed: September 28, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Haywood
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family & Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/21/12. (nll)
January 10, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Consent Motion to Consolidate Deadlines. Defendants shall file their answers or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on January 21, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/10/13. (nll)
October 16, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 30 Motion to Stay; striking 30 Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/15/13. (nll)
December 2, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Stay; denying 36 Motion to Remand to Bankruptcy Court. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/2/13. (nll)
January 31, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants pending Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 25] and Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 41] shall be held in abeyance; that within 14 days of the entry of this Order the Bankruptcy Trustee may file a motion pursuant to Rule 17(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure seeking to ratify, join,and/or be substituted as the real party in interest; and further ORDERED that the trial of this matter is hereby CONTINUED from the March 10, 2014 trial term and will be reset at a later date. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/31/14. (khm)
March 6, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 58 Motion to Confirm Ratification. As the Trustee in Bankruptcy has now ratified this action, the Plaintiff's claims shall be allowed to proceed. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/05/2014. (thh)
March 24, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Plaintiffs Objection re Defendants Reply Brief 50 is OVERRULED. Plaintiff may file a surreply brief within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 3/24/2014. (khm)
June 9, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of Court calendar defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss and 41 Motion for Summary Judgment during the next available Asheville civil motions day. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 6/9/14. (khm)
August 29, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER denying Defts' 25 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part Defts' 41 Motion for Summary Judgment, and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/29/14. (ejb)
August 29, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Memorandum of Decision and Order dated 8/29/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Queen v. Haywood Regional Medical Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westcare, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Yarbrough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haywood Regional Medical Center Medical Care Plan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haywood Regional Medical Center Employee Benefit Plan-Life Insurance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haywood Regional Medical Center, a Hospital Authority
Represented By: Jonathan W. Yarbrough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haywood Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Jonathan W. Yarbrough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medwest Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Yarbrough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia A. Queen
Represented By: David A Wijewickrama
Represented By: John C. Cloninger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]